Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Meetings

Day(s)

As of: 12/4/2021 2:38:32 PM
Thursday, November 4, 2021
Senate
Created: 11/3/2021 1:36 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
9:00 AM to 3:00 PM - Site Visit
Wilde Lake Middle School and Holabird Academy
Tour of Net-Zero Schools

House
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 10/19/2021 11:26 AM
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - Briefing
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Maryland Dept. of Health-Behavioral Health Administrative Services Organization

Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - (Health and Government Operations Committee)
Created: 10/20/2021 3:04 PM
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Briefing
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Joint briefing with Appropriations’ Health and Social Services Subcommittee
--The briefing with be from MDH on their behavioral health administrative services organization (Optum).

Revenues Subcommittee - (Ways and Means Committee)
Created: 10/12/2021 3:18 PM
Revenues Subcommittee
10:00 AM to 12:00 PM - Site Visit
Site Visit to Tradepoint Atlantic
1600 Sparrows Point Blvd.
Sparrows Point, MD 21219

Other
Hall of Records Commission
Created: 9/16/2021 10:42 AM
2:00 PM - Google Meet Video Conference
Meeting Video
Join by phone: (US) +1 339-545-2499
PIN:590 901 297#
Semi annual meeting of the Hall of Records Commission.

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Created: 10/25/2021 8:40 AM
10:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Pathways to Health Equity Informational Meeting
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 942 3565 3359 Passcode: 852814
Dial-in: (301) 715-8592 Meeting ID: 942 3565 3359 Passcode: 852814
Additional opportunity for members of the public to ask questions regarding the Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals.
CHRC will also respond to any follow-up questions from participants from the November 1 meeting at First Baptist Church of Glenarden.

Created: 10/25/2021 8:31 AM
4:30 PM - Governor's Hall at Sailwinds West, 200 Byrn Street, Cambridge, MD 21613
Pathways to Health Equity Informational Meeting
Registration Encouraged
Informational Meeting to the Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals.

Maryland Orphans Courts, Task Force to Study
Created: 10/18/2021 2:39 PM
11:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
To view the meeting click here
Meeting to fulfill mandate of House Bill 681.

Click to return on the top page