Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Meetings

Day(s)

As of: 12/4/2021 2:33:23 PM
Wednesday, November 3, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Assessment and Funding of School Facilities, Workgroup on the
Created: 10/25/2021 10:00 AM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Public testimony related to the School Facilities Assessment may be submitted to Michele Lambert (Michele.Lambert@mlis.state.md.us)

Board of Public Works
Created: 10/21/2021 12:38 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach livestream click here
10 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Fl, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis (Limited Capacity)
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting

Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission
Created: 9/20/2021 9:33 AM
6:00 PM to 8:00 PM - Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Baltimore County Redistricting Hearing
Owings Mills Branch Library, 10302 Grand Central Avenue, Owings Mills, MD 21117
Meeting Agenda
Guidelines for Public Hearings and Submission of Testimony and Plans
Meeting Material #1
Meeting Material #2
Legislative Redistricting

Sports Wagering Application Review Commission
Created: 10/25/2021 3:11 PM
10:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
The meeting will be live streamed. A link will be provided once the stream begins. Part of the meeting may be closed to the public in accordance with Open Meetings Act procedures.
Click here to see the Commission webpage for more details.

Click to return on the top page