Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/1/2022 11:53:56 AM
Wednesday, November 2, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Created: 11/1/2022 11:50 AM
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
12:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Blueprint AIB Pillar 3 Advisory Committee
Meeting Video
Meeting Agenda
Discussion of the Draft Blueprint Comprehensive Implementation Plan.

Created: 10/26/2022 1:17 PM
4:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Blueprint AIB Pillar 1 Advisory Committee
Meeting Video
Further Discussion of the Draft Blueprint Implementation Plan.

Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Created: 10/6/2022 5:00 PM
12:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Framework, Design & RFP Subcommittee
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 471 747 7346 Passcode: Xkie4R Dial-In #: 301-715-8592
Meeting of the Framework, Design & RFP Subcommittee of the Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports

Click to return on the top page