Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 11/30/2023 3:24:53 PM
Wednesday, November 1, 2023
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Joint Committee on Federal Relations
Created: 10/16/2023 4:49 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing by National Conference of State Legislatures on Current Congressional/Federal Issues Relevant to the States.

Joint Committee on the Management of Public Funds
Created: 8/24/2023 3:28 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Update from TEDCO, MARBIDCO, the Department of Commerce, and Meridian Managment Group

Joint Subcommittee on Program Open Space/Agricultural Land Preservation
Created: 9/6/2023 1:15 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Potential Legislation and Budget Priorities to Consider.

Transparency Standards for State's Attorneys, Task Force to Study
Created: 10/18/2023 2:38 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Case Management Systems for Prosecutors
(Added - 10/30/2023 8:46 AM)
The Maryland Electronic Courts (MDEC) System and case management systems for prosecutors.
(Removed - 10/30/2023 8:46 AM)

Click to return on the top page