Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/1/2022 11:51:25 AM
Tuesday, November 1, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 8/29/2022 10:00 AM
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - Briefing
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
11:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
• MDH Update on Optum
• MIA’s Market Conduct Study on Optum

Created: 8/23/2022 2:57 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Update: MDH on Optum issue
Briefing on MIA's Market Conduct Study of Optum
(Added - 10/20/2022 4:18 PM)
Optum Policy on Physician Reimbursement in the Emergency Room for Treatment of Behavioral Health
(Added - 10/20/2022 4:18 PM)
Briefing on MIA's Market Conduct Study of Optum
(Removed - 10/20/2022 4:18 PM)

Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Created: 11/1/2022 11:41 AM
4:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Blueprint AIB Pillar 4 Advisory Committee
Meeting Video
Meeting Agenda
Discussion of the Draft Blueprint Comprehensive Implementation Plan.

House Cannabis Referendum and Legalization Workgroup
Created: 10/19/2022 8:25 AM
7:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
A presentation on the Social Equity Toolkit, a recently updated and detailed survey of what states are doing around the nation regarding social equity and licensure related to cannabis legalization.
(Added - 11/1/2022 11:21 AM)
The presentation will be given by Mathew Swinburne, Associate Director, The Network for Public Health Law-Eastern Region-at the University of Maryland Francis King Carey School of Law.
(Added - 11/1/2022 11:21 AM)
A presentation on the Social Equity Toolkit, a recently updated and detailed survey of what states are doing around the nation regarding social equity and licensure related to cannabis legalization.
(Removed - 11/1/2022 11:21 AM)

Click to return on the top page