Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Meetings

Day(s)

As of: 12/4/2021 1:56:32 PM
Thursday, October 28, 2021
Senate
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 10/4/2021 11:39 AM
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Briefing
2:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Joint with the House Education and Economic Development Subcommittee
Briefing on Maryland Department of Labor - BEACON Mobile Application

House
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 9/30/2021 12:19 PM
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Briefing
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Maryland Dept. of Labor - BEACON Mobile Application

Other
Legislative Redistricting Advisory Commission
Created: 9/20/2021 9:28 AM
6:00 PM to 8:00 PM - Remote Stream Location / YouTube
Southern Maryland Redistricting Hearing
North Point High School, Cafeteria, 2500 Davis Road, Waldorf, MD 20603
Meeting Agenda
Guidelines for Public Hearings and Submission of Testimony and Plans
Meeting Material #1
Meeting Material #2
Legislative Redistricting

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Created: 10/20/2021 9:34 AM
10:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 978 5066 0128 Passcode: 878519
Dial-in#: 301-715-8592 Meeting ID: 978 5066 0128 Passcode: 878519
Additional opportunity for members of the public to ask questions regarding the Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals. CHRC will also respond to any follow-up questions from participants from the October 26 meeting at Coppin State University.

Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee
Created: 10/13/2021 9:27 AM
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Webex-Teleconference
Due to COVID-19, this meeting will be held via Webinar-teleconference. To join the meeting click here
TBD

Maryland Orphans Courts, Task Force to Study
Created: 10/18/2021 2:37 PM
11:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
To view the meeting click here
Meeting to fulfill mandate of House Bill 681.

Click to return on the top page