Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/3/2023 4:53:17 PM
Monday, October 23, 2023
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 9/27/2023 2:51 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee
7:45 AM - Site Visit
Maryland Department of Agriculture Legislative Tour
Meeting Agenda

Other
Maryland Life Sciences Advisory Board
Created: 9/22/2023 7:18 AM
Friday, September 22, 2023 12:00 PM to 2:00 PM - 1746 World Trade Center, 401 East Pratt St. Baltimore, MD
12:00 PM to 2:00 PM - 1746 World Trade Center, 401 East Pratt St. Baltimore, MD
The Maryland Life Sciences Advisory Board will meet to discuss issues pertaining to the life sciences and medical technology communities.

Click to return on the top page