Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Meetings

Day(s)

As of: 12/4/2021 3:41:02 PM
Thursday, October 14, 2021
Senate
Created: 10/4/2021 11:39 AM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services on the Status of Revenues

House
Early Childhood Subcommittee - (Ways and Means Committee)
Created: 10/13/2021 3:56 PM
Early Childhood Subcommittee
10:00 AM - Site Visit
Ivymount School
11614 Seven Locks Road
Rockville, MD 20853

Other
Capital Debt Affordability Committee
Created: 8/12/2021 11:17 AM
1:00 PM - Assembly Room, 1st Floor, Louis L. Goldstein Treasury Bldg., 80 Calvert St., Annapolis, MD
Review of tax supported debt and the size and condition of debt of higher Education institutions.

Economic Stability, House Study Group on
Created: 10/7/2021 5:16 PM
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Presentation from United Way of Maryland.

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Created: 10/12/2021 12:56 PM
4:00 PM - Zoom Meeting
Health Equity Resource Communities-Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 93320884452 Passcode: 094125
Dial-In Number: 301-715-8592 Meeting ID: 93320884452: Passcode: 094125
Statewide "Kick-Off" meeting to discuss the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission release of the Pathways to Health Equity Call for Proposals.

Maryland Orphans Courts, Task Force to Study
Created: 10/7/2021 2:52 PM
11:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
To view the meeting click here
Second meeting of the Task Force to Study Maryland Orphans Courts.
Meeting to fulfill mandate of House Bill 681.

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Created: 9/20/2021 1:17 PM
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
To watch the livestream click here and click on "Stream" under the appropriate date.
Public teleconference to discuss normal IAC business.

Sports Wagering Application Review Commission
Canceled
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
The meeting will be live streamed. A link will be provided once the stream begins.
Part of the meeting may be closed to the public in accordance with Open Meetings Act procedures.
Click hereto see the Commission webpage for more details.

Click to return on the top page