Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/2/2022 5:24:49 AM
Thursday, September 22, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Created: 9/12/2022 3:16 PM
10:00 AM - UMBC Tech Center, Main Seminar Room, 1450 S. Rolling Road, Halethorpe, MD
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 823 2540 9075 Passcode: 231705 Dial-In #: 301-715-8592

Maryland Medicaid Advisory Committee
Created: 8/29/2022 11:22 AM
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Webex-Teleconference
Due to COVID-19, this meeting will be held through GotoWebinar-teleconference only
To join online click here
TBD

Sports Wagering Application Review Commission
Created: 9/9/2022 12:23 PM
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
The meeting will be live streamed on YouTube. See the Commission webpage for more details.

Click to return on the top page