Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/3/2023 4:06:56 PM
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 9/11/2023 2:45 PM
Judiciary Committee
9:30 AM to 2:30 PM - Site Visit
Hosted by the Maryland Judiciary at the Catonsville District Courthouse

Other
Board of Public Works
Created: 3/24/2023 12:32 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach the livestream link click here
10 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd FL, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting

Health Equity Resource Community (HERC) Advisory Committee
Created: 9/12/2023 11:32 AM
2:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Pathways Calls for Proposals/Design Subcommittee
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 822 8754 2209 Passcode: 229759 Dial-in #: 1-301-715-8592
For additional meeting information click here

Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight
Created: 8/9/2023 3:56 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on State Personnel Systems.
Workplace Culture and Employee Relations at:
The Department of Natural Resources, the Maryland State Police, and the Department of Public Safety

Sports Wagering Application Review Commission
Canceled
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
The meeting will be live streamed on YouTube
Part of the meeting may be closed to the public in accordance with Open Meetings Act procedures
For more details see the Commission webpage

Click to return on the top page