Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/3/2023 4:34:30 PM
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 9/13/2023 4:41 PM
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee
10:00 AM - Site Visit
Tour of the Port of Baltimore

Other
Joint Subcommittee on Program Open Space/Agricultural Land Preservation
Created: 9/6/2023 11:54 AM
Overview
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Background Presentation on Program Open Space, Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Program, and Allied Programs

Maryland Consortium on Coordinated Community Supports
Created: 9/12/2023 11:24 AM
9:30 AM - Atman-Glazer Building, Room 164 A&B, 45 Calvert St. , Annapolis, MD 21401
10:30 AM - Atman-Glazer Building, Room 164 A&B, 45 Calvert St. , Annapolis, MD 21401
Space is limited. Members of the public wishing to attend in person are asked to register. To register for the meeting click here
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 822 0380 2613 Passcode: 298996 Dial-In:#: 301-715-8592

Program Approval Process Workgroup
Created: 9/11/2023 9:22 AM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Overview of the use of mission statements by institutions of higher education.

Click to return on the top page