Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/2/2022 5:26:15 AM
Thursday, September 15, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Created: 8/29/2022 2:42 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Blueprint Summer Working Session #7 Pillars 1 and 2.
(Added - 9/6/2022 4:42 PM)
Blueprint Summer Working Session #7.
(Removed - 9/6/2022 4:42 PM)

Financial Education and Capability Commission
Created: 9/6/2022 9:34 AM
1:00 PM to 2:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
Email lonia@cashmd.org to RSVP
Meeting to receive debrief from MSDE.

Oral Health in Maryland, Task Force on
Created: 5/5/2022 1:11 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
For additional information click here
Meeting of the Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland.

Click to return on the top page