Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/2/2022 5:17:26 AM
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Board of Public Works
Created: 6/27/2022 3:16 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach the livestream link click here
10 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Fl, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis (Limited Capacity)
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting

Joint Committee on Federal Relations
Created: 8/16/2022 3:14 PM
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Management of Maryland toll policy/billing and revenue collection from an interstate perspective (impacts on, and compliance of, out-of-state drivers).

Maryland Life Sciences Advisory Board
Created: 3/14/2022 1:46 PM
Thursday, June 23, 2022 9:00 AM to 11:00 AM - 1701 World Trade Center, 401 East Pratt St. Baltimore, MD
12:00 PM to 2:00 PM - 1701 World Trade Center, 401 East Pratt St. Baltimore, MD
The Maryland Life Sciences Advisory Board will meet to discuss issues pertaining to the life sciences and medical technology communities.

Click to return on the top page