Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/3/2023 4:07:54 PM
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
Created: 7/18/2023 1:44 PM
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
*This briefing will be held virtually.*
Department of Juvenile Services
(Added - 8/7/2023 10:50 AM)
Maryland Chiefs and Sheriffs' Association
(Added - 8/7/2023 10:50 AM)
Office of the Public Defender
(Added - 8/7/2023 10:50 AM)
State's Attorneys' Association
(Added - 8/7/2023 10:50 AM)
Maryland Judiciary
(Added - 8/7/2023 10:50 AM)

Created: 8/17/2023 9:20 AM
Ways and Means Committee
10:00 AM to 11:00 AM - Site Visit
Dorchester County Government Building, 501 Court Lane, Cambridge, Room 110
Ways and Means Committee Meet and Greet with the State Administrator of Elections and the State Board of Elections

Other
Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority
Created: 9/5/2023 8:48 AM
9:00 AM - One Call Center, Suite 104, Lower Level Conference Rm., 7223 Parkway Drive, Hanover, MD
In Person Meeting of Full Authority+Formal Hearings+Closed Executive Session

Transportation Revenue and Infrastructure Needs, Maryland Commission on
Created: 9/5/2023 10:22 AM
9:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Click to return on the top page