Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 12/3/2023 4:04:15 PM
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
Senate
Created: 8/28/2023 3:22 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
8:30 AM to 6:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Site Visit - PJM in Valley Forge, PA
EEE Committee Members Only
(Added - 8/28/2023 3:23 PM)
Site - PJM in Valley Forge, PA
(Removed - 8/28/2023 3:23 PM)

House
Created: 8/1/2023 4:28 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee
8:30 AM - Site Visit
Site Visits in Baltimore/Howard County Region.
(Added - 8/29/2023 2:36 PM)
Site Visits in Baltimore Area
(Removed - 8/29/2023 2:36 PM)

Created: 8/17/2023 8:58 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
12:00 PM to 5:30 PM - Site Visit
Hyatt Regency Chesapeake Bay, Skipjack Meeting Room, Cambridge, MD
Meeting Agenda
Meeting Materials
Briefings by:
Cambridge Waterfront Development Inc.
MD Dept. of Commerce
MD Lottery and Gaming Control Commission
MD State Dept. of Education
MD State Education Association
MD Association of Boards of Education
(Added - 8/21/2023 9:41 AM)
Public School Superintendents' Association of MD
(Added - 8/21/2023 9:33 AM)
Public School Superintendents' Association of MD
(Removed - 8/21/2023 9:33 AM)
MD Association of Boards of Education
(Removed - 8/21/2023 9:41 AM)

Other
Criminal Sentencing Policy, State Commission On
Created: 7/14/2023 1:42 PM
5:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
The MSCCSP will meet via videoconference. Meeting Video
The Commission will continue the review and evaluation of the State's sentencing guidelines and policies.

Click to return on the top page