Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 10/22/2021 1:23:17 PM
Thursday, September 9, 2021
Senate
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 8/2/2021 4:27 PM
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Briefing
2:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
The Subcommittee is invited to participate in the House Education and Economic Development Subcommittee briefing on the following topic:
- Institutions of Higher Education Fall Semester Operations

House
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 7/20/2021 11:13 AM
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Briefing
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Institutions of Higher Education Fall Semester Operations
(Added - 9/8/2021 1:06 PM)

Other
Financial Education and Capability Commission
Created: 5/4/2021 2:51 PM
10:00 AM to 11:30 AM - Virtual Meeting
Email lonia@cashmd.org
to RSVP
Discuss topics related to financial education and expanding capability.

Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness
Created: 8/10/2021 1:05 PM
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Update on Housing Relief Programs and Evictions

Juvenile Justice Reform Council
Created: 8/30/2021 10:30 AM
1:00 PM to 2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
12:30 PM to 2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Quality Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities, Oversight Committee on
Created: 7/20/2021 4:18 PM
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - Google Meet Video Conference
Meeting Video
To join by phone, please dial: +1-361-247-0114
PIN: 987 704 583
Regularly Scheduled Meeting

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Created: 8/17/2021 7:19 AM
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
To watch the livestream click here and click on "Stream" under the appropriate date.
Public teleconference to discuss normal IAC business.

Click to return on the top page