Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 10/20/2021 7:56:11 AM
Wednesday, September 8, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Health Equity Resource Community (HERC) Advisory Committee
Created: 8/30/2021 8:40 PM
8:30 AM - Zoom Meeting
Pathways Calls for Proposals/Design Subcommittee
Meeting Video
Meeting ID: 979 8866 5861 Passcode: 441225
Dial-in: 1-301-715-8592
Meeting ID: 979 8866 5861 Passcode: 441225
Meeting of the Pathways Calls for Proposals/Design Subcommittee of the Health Equity Resource Communities Advisory Committee.

House Cannabis Referendum and Legalization Workgroup
Created: 8/19/2021 10:32 AM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Virtual Organizational Meeting
Briefing on National Historical Background regarding Cannabis Legislation.
(Added - 8/26/2021 11:13 AM)
Briefing on Maryland and National Historical Background regarding Cannabis Legislation.
(Removed - 8/26/2021 11:13 AM)

Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families
Created: 8/24/2021 4:10 PM
Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing on economic impacts of the COVID-19 pandemic on women and families.

Maryland Health Insurance Coverage Protection Commission
Created: 8/5/2021 4:17 PM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Updates on Federal Health Insurance Policies
The State Reinsurance Program
The Young Adult Subsidy Program

Click to return on the top page