Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 9/28/2021 2:52:53 AM
Monday, August 16, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Joint Committee on Unemployment Insurance Oversight
Created: 7/28/2021 4:24 PM
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing by the Maryland Department of Labor on the implementation status of:
(Added - 8/4/2021 1:54 PM)
• the study of system reforms required under Chapters 45 and 46 of 2021; and
(Added - 8/4/2021 1:54 PM)
• other 2021 legislation related to the State unemployment insurance program.
(Added - 8/4/2021 1:54 PM)
Discussion of Interim Report with the Maryland Department of Labor
(Removed - 8/4/2021 1:54 PM)

Sports Wagering Application Review Commission
Created: 7/27/2021 12:30 PM
8:00 AM to 10:00 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
The meeting will be live streamed. A link will be provided once the stream begins.
Click here to see the Commission webpage for more details and the agenda.
Organizational Meeting

Click to return on the top page