Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 9/28/2021 3:39:56 AM
Wednesday, July 7, 2021
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Assessment and Funding of School Facilities, Workgroup on the
Created: 6/21/2021 4:33 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube

Board of Public Works
Created: 6/8/2021 1:06 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach the livestream link click here
10:00 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Fl, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis (Limited Capacity)
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting

Maryland Underground Facilities Damage Prevention Authority
Created: 6/30/2021 2:54 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Meeting Video
Phone Dial-In: 1-301-715-8592
Waiting Room Opens at 8:30 am.
Open Meeting of Full Authority+ Closed Executive Session.

Click to return on the top page