Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 8/11/2022 10:16:27 PM
Thursday, June 16, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Created: 6/7/2022 11:21 AM
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Blueprint Implementation Planning Session - Pillars 3 and 5 - College and Career Readiness and Governance and Accountability

Hall of Records Commission
Created: 5/17/2022 4:42 PM
2:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Meeting Video
To Join by Phone: (US) +1 336-904-9242 PIN: 127 328 871#
Semi-annual meeting of the Hall of Records Commission

Oral Health in Maryland, Task Force on
Created: 5/5/2022 1:04 PM
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
For additional information click here
Meeting of the Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland.

Sports Wagering Application Review Commission
Created: 5/26/2022 10:11 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
The meeting will be live streamed on YouTube.
Part of the meeting may be closed to the public in accordance with Open Meetings Act procedures.
For more details see the Commission webpage

Click to return on the top page