Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 8/11/2022 10:09:53 PM
Wednesday, June 8, 2022
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Aging, Maryland Commission on
Canceled
10:00 AM to 12:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
Regularly Scheduled Meeting

Board of Public Works
Created: 4/5/2022 12:26 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach livestream click here
10 AM-Treasury Building, 1st Floor, 80 Calvert St., Annapolis (Limited Capacity)
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting and Bond Sale
(Added - 4/27/2022 4:47 PM)
General Meeting
(Removed - 4/27/2022 4:47 PM)

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Created: 6/2/2022 8:36 AM
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
To watch the livestream, click here
and click on "Stream" under the appropriate date.
For additional meeting information click here
Public virtual meeting to discuss normal IAC business.

Click to return on the top page