Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 7/23/2024 9:14:49 PM
Wednesday, June 5, 2024
Senate
No hearings scheduled for today
House
No hearings scheduled for today
Other
Accountability and Implementation Board Nominating Committee
Created: 5/16/2024 3:06 PM
Work Session
2:00 PM to 3:30 PM - Executive Session
2:00 PM to 3:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Work Session.

Board of Public Works
Created: 10/25/2023 3:55 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
11:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach the livestream link click here
10 AM-1st Floor Assembly Room, Treasury Building, 80 Calvert Street, Annapolis
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting
Bond Sale
(Added - 4/9/2024 3:40 PM)

Click to return on the top page