Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 6/8/2023 6:54:03 PM
Monday, April 10, 2023
Senate
Created: 4/8/2023 11:47 AM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
10:00 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Created: 4/9/2023 7:26 AM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Voting Session
10:00 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

Created: 4/10/2023 11:25 AM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
12:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Mont Co Deleg and PG Co Deleg

Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Service Near Regional Transit Districts and Neighborhood Centers in Prince George's County - Contracts MC/PG 111-23
Mont Co Deleg and PG Co Deleg

Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Prince George's County - Commissioner Qualifications MC/PG 108-23
(Removed - 4/10/2023 1:35 PM)

Created: 4/10/2023 2:57 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Voting Session
3:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Del Love, et al

Natural Resources - Black Bear Conflict Reduction and Damage Reimbursement Fund - Uses
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Education, Energy, and the Environment)

Created: 4/8/2023 7:56 AM
Finance Committee - Voting Session
10:00 AM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Created: 4/10/2023 2:38 PM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
4:15 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Mont Co Deleg and PG Co Deleg

Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Collective Bargaining Agreement Implementation - Dispute Arbitration MC/PG 103-23

Created: 4/10/2023 2:32 PM
Finance Committee - Voting Session
4:15 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
4:30 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Del Cullison, et al

Grocery Stores and Restaurants - Automated External Defibrillator Program (Joe Sheya Act)
(Added - 4/10/2023 3:40 PM)

Created: 4/10/2023 9:09 AM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
10:00 AM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

Created: 4/7/2023 8:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Del Grammer

Workgroup to Study Community Association Standing in Nuisance Actions in Baltimore County
St. Mary's County Delegation

St. Mary's County - Transfer of Child Support Unit and Personnel to the Child Support Administration
(Removed - 4/10/2023 12:33 PM)

Created: 4/10/2023 3:13 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
3:45 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

House
Created: 4/8/2023 3:07 PM
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
10:30 AM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Sen Benson, et al

Higher Education - Maryland 529 Program - Reform
This bill is SPONSOR only oral testimony.

Created: 4/10/2023 4:24 PM
Appropriations Committee - Voting Session
4:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Created: 4/10/2023 8:12 PM
Appropriations Committee - Voting Session
9:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Created: 4/10/2023 2:22 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Voting Session
2:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Concurrences Only

Created: 4/10/2023 10:53 AM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Created: 4/10/2023 3:48 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
4:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Created: 4/10/2023 8:00 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
8:15 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Created: 4/10/2023 2:34 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Voting Session
3:15 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Concurrences. Voting will begin at 4:30p.

Created: 4/8/2023 2:53 PM
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
9:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Sen Muse

Criminal Procedure - Expungement and Shielding - Probation Before Judgment for Driving While Impaired or Under the Influence

Created: 4/10/2023 10:11 AM
Judiciary Committee - Voting Session
10:30 AM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Sen Muse

Criminal Procedure - Expungement and Shielding - Probation Before Judgment for Driving While Impaired or Under the Influence
Sen Smith (Md Jud Conf)

Government Officials - Public Disclosure of Personal Information
Sen Sydnor

Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions

Created: 4/10/2023 3:23 PM
Judiciary Committee - Voting Session
4:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Sen Smith (Md Jud Conf)

Government Officials - Public Disclosure of Personal Information
Sen Sydnor

Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sen Carter

Courts - Prohibited Liability Agreements - Recreational Facilities
Sen Sydnor

Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices

Created: 4/8/2023 3:23 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
10:30 AM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
1:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Hearing will begin immediately following the first House floor session
Sen Guzzone (Office of the Comptroller)

Income Tax – Out–of–State Taxes Paid by Pass–Through Entities – Addition Modification
This bill is Sponsor only oral testimony

Created: 4/10/2023 11:57 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Voting Session
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
3:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Del Amprey, et al

Sale of Residential Real Property - Offers to Purchase and Transfer Tax
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Ways and Means)
(Added - 4/10/2023 1:24 PM)
Del Sample-Hughes, et al

Sales and Use Tax - Electricity for Agricultural Purposes
Sen Guzzone (Office of the Comptroller)

Income Tax – Out–of–State Taxes Paid by Pass–Through Entities – Addition Modification
Sen Jackson, et al

Sales and Use Tax - Electricity for Agricultural Purposes - Exemption
Sen King

Libraries - Circulation Records - Inspection, Use, or Disclosure Requirement Revision
(Added - 4/10/2023 1:24 PM)

Created: 4/10/2023 6:25 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Voting Session
7:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Sens King and Elfreth

Income Tax - Captive Real Estate Investment Trusts - Alterations

Other
No hearings scheduled for today
Click to return on the top page