Day(s)
As of: 6/8/2023 7:04:50 PM
Created: 4/4/2023 6:06 PM
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Capital Budget Subcommittee Reports Decisions
Created: 4/5/2023 12:16 PM
2:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Created: 4/3/2023 2:36 PM
8:30 AM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
9:00 AM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Work Session on House Bill 901
Created: 4/5/2023 11:22 AM
2:00 PM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
2:30 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Created: 4/5/2023 1:56 PM
3:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Del Clippinger, et al
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Possession and Permits to Carry, Wear, and Transport a Handgun
Created: 4/4/2023 8:25 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
2:00 PM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
3:30 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Voting has been postponed to tomorrow morning.
Created: 4/5/2023 11:18 AM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Created: 4/5/2023 12:02 PM
12:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Sen Smith
Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Provisions - Application of Prohibition
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Economic Matters)
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Economic Matters)
Created: 4/5/2023 11:40 AM
1:00 PM
-
Zoom / YouTube
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Created: 4/5/2023 10:26 AM
1:00 PM
-
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
12:45 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Amendments and concurrences.
Created: 4/5/2023 9:12 AM
12:00 PM
-
House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
12:40 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Created: 3/22/2023 3:22 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 3/29/2023 11:33 AM)
Sen Carter
Juvenile Law - Child in Need of Supervision - Mandatory Petition and Notice (NyKayla Strawder Memorial Act)
Chr JPR (Dept)
Public Health - Youth Camps, Development Organizations, and Programs - Criminal History Records Checks
- SB 293
Created: 4/3/2023 9:31 AM
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Voting Session will take place after bill hearing
Created: 4/5/2023 11:43 AM
12:45 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Sen Guzzone, et al
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Purse Dedication Account - Ocean Downs Race Course Operating Loss Assistance
Sen Kagan, et al
Election Law - Ballot Processing and Reporting Procedures and 2024 Primary Date
Sen Griffith, et al
Film Production Activity Income Tax Credit - Alterations and Maryland Entertainment Council
Sen Hester
Preservation and Reuse of Historic Complexes Study and Extension of the Income Tax Credit for Catalytic Revitalization Projects
Created: 1/6/2023 12:56 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach the livestream link click here
10 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Fl, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis
For participation details please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
10 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Fl, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis
For participation details please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting
The County Affairs Committee covers the following and related issue areas:
All local and bi-county bills are assigned to one of the following committees for study and review before being voted on in the full House Delegation. The local committee then votes to make a recommendation to the full delegation.
Economic Development
County Government