Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 5/6/2021 12:47:39 PM
Monday, April 5, 2021
Senate
Created: 4/5/2021 1:02 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Voting Session
4:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Del Lierman

State and Local Housing Programs – Affirmatively Furthering Fair Housing
Del Qi

Commission on LGBTQ Affairs – Established
Dels Luedtke and Griffith

Student and Military Voter Empowerment Act
Del Kelly

Health Occupation – Licensing of Audiology Assistants
Del Qi

Mobile Laundry for the Homeless Pilot Program
Del Stein

Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Del Rosenberg

Maryland Technology Internship Program - Qualifications for Participation - Alterations
Del Smith

Maryland Longitudinal Data System - Transfer of Student Data - Modifications
Del Wilson

Education - Child Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention - Hiring Emergent Employees
Del Adams

Business Regulation – Home Improvement Contracts – Deposits
Del Solomon

Public-Private Partnerships and the Collection of Video Tolls
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Del Chisholm

Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Definitions
Del Valderrama

Professional Land Surveyors - Surveying Practice - Definition and Licensing Exception
Del D. Jones

Education - Student Data Privacy - Reports and Student Data Privacy Council Sunset Extension
Del Reznik

State Procurement - Emergency and Expedited Procurements - Revisions and Reporting
Howard County Delegation

Howard County – School Redistricting – Public Testimony Ho. Co. 07-21
Howard County Delegation

Howard County – Board of Education – Redetermination of Geographic Attendance Area Ho. Co. 05-21
Del Washington

Guaranteed Access Grant and Next Generation Scholars of Maryland – Alterations
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Del Bridges

Environment - Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities - Reform
Del Lierman

Department of Housing and Community Development – Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program – Establishment
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Lee

Education - Student Data Privacy - Reports and Student Data Privacy Council Sunset Extension
Sen Lam

Emergency and Expedited Procurements – Reform
Sen Hayes

Department of Housing and Community Development – Appraisal Gap From Historic Redlining Financial Assistance Program – Establishment
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)

Created: 4/2/2021 3:02 PM
Finance Committee - Voting Session
5:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Del Lierman

Electricity and Gas - Energy Suppliers - Supply Offers
(Added - 4/5/2021 10:37 AM)
Del Charkoudian

Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems
(Removed - 4/5/2021 1:55 PM)
Sen Feldman

Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard and Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems
(Removed - 4/5/2021 1:55 PM)

Created: 4/5/2021 1:11 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
4:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

House
Oversight Committee on Personnel - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 4/5/2021 2:01 PM
Oversight Committee on Personnel - Voting Session
5:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Created: 4/5/2021 4:15 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Kramer

Business Regulation – Retail Pet Stores – Modifications (No More Puppy– and Kitten–Mills Act of 2021)
Sen Beidle, et al

Anne Arundel County - Board of License Commissioners - Chief Inspector

Created: 4/5/2021 12:50 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Voting Session
5:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Griffith

Energy Efficiency - Net-Zero Homes - Contract Preferences
(Added - 4/5/2021 2:53 PM)
Sen Waldstreicher, et al

Local Government - Humane Society and Animal Control Officers - Education and Training Requirements
(Added - 4/5/2021 2:53 PM)
Sens Elfreth and Bailey

Environment and Natural Resources – Complaints, Inspections, and Enforcement – Information Maintenance and Reporting
(Added - 4/5/2021 2:53 PM)
Sen Simonaire

Local Government – Animal Control Facilities – Adoption Fee Waiver for Veterans (Pets for Vets Act of 2021)
(Added - 4/5/2021 2:53 PM)
Sen Smith

State and Local Housing Programs - Affirmatively Furthering Fair Housing
(Added - 4/5/2021 2:53 PM)

Environment Subcommittee - (Environment and Transportation Committee)
Created: 4/2/2021 11:33 AM
Environment Subcommittee - Work Session
12:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Created: 4/3/2021 10:51 AM
Judiciary Committee - Voting Session
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sens Carozza and West

Criminal Law – Life–Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel – Criminal Negligence (Wade’s Law)
Sens Elfreth and Hettleman

Criminal Law - Law Enforcement Officers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity
Sen Sydnor

Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
Sen Kramer

Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Veterinary Care of Retired Law Enforcement K-9s Act
Sens Lee and Waldstreicher

Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Fourth Degree Sexual Offense and Spousal Defense
Sen Hettleman

Action for Change of Name - Waiver of Publication Requirement
Sen Jackson

Criminal Law - Harm to Service Animals
Sen Lee

Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers
Sen Hayes

Baltimore City - Police Officers - Promotional Appointments
Sen Waldstreicher

Arrest Warrants Issued by District Court Commissioners - Recall by Judge
Sen McCray

Sheriff of Baltimore City
Sen West

Wills, Powers of Attorney, and Advance Directives - Electronic Execution
(Removed - 4/5/2021 12:42 PM)

Criminal Law and Procedure Subcommittee - (Judiciary Committee)
Created: 4/3/2021 10:51 AM
Criminal Law and Procedure Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Waldstreicher

Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems - Administration of Ketamine - Data Collection
Chr FIN (Dept)

Correctional Education – Changes to Mandatory Education Requirements
Sens Waldstreicher and Augustine

Crimes - Indecent Exposure - Definition
Sen Sydnor

Public Information Act - Inspection of Records From Body-Worn Digital Recording Devices

Family and Juvenile Law Subcommittee - (Judiciary Committee)
Created: 4/3/2021 10:51 AM
Family and Juvenile Law Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Chr JPR (Dept)

Secretary of State - Address Confidentiality Programs - Merger of Programs and Expanded Participant Eligibility
Sen Hough

Family Law - Preventing or Interfering With Report of Suspected Sexual Abuse of a Child - Statute of Limitations

Civil Law and Procedure Subcommittee - (Judiciary Committee)
Created: 4/3/2021 10:51 AM
Civil Law and Procedure Subcommittee - Bill Hearing
11:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
12:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Waldstreicher, et al

Civil Actions - Financial Exploitation of Susceptible Adults and Older Adults (Maryland SAFE Act)
Chr EHE (Dept)

Maryland Military Department – Sale of Superfluous Armories

Other
Baltimore County
Created: 4/2/2021 2:54 PM
Voting Session
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Hettleman

Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining

No. 11 - Baltimore City
Created: 3/30/2021 3:23 PM
6:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting with Baltimore City Stakeholders.

No. 7 - Prince George's County
Created: 4/2/2021 1:42 PM
4:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
3:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Prince George's County Senate Delegation Meeting

Senate Vaccine Oversight Workgroup
Created: 4/1/2021 8:07 AM
4:00 PM to 5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page