Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 5/23/2024 3:43:15 PM
Wednesday, April 3, 2024
Senate
Created: 4/3/2024 2:37 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
2:45 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Canceled
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
House bills are sponsor only, unless there is opposition. If there is opposition, the Committee will hear from a limited number of proponents and a limited number of opponents. Below each bill is indication of whether it will be a sponsor only or limited witness hearing.
Frederick County Delegation

Boundary of the Frederick County Soil Conservation District - Alteration
Del Guyton, et al

State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Veterinary Technicians and Veterinary Assistants
Del Allen

Reservoir, Dam, or Waterway Obstruction Construction Permits - Conditions for Exemption
Howard County Delegation

Howard County Agricultural Preservation Advisory Board - Term Length - Alteration Ho. Co. 15-24
Del Ruff, et al

Natural Resources - Gwynns Falls State Park - Focus Group, Advisory Committee, and Report
Dels Adams and Hutchinson

Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds - Municipal Wastewater Facilities - Sunset Repeal

Created: 4/3/2024 12:32 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Voting Session
1:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
3:15 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

Created: 4/3/2024 10:49 AM
Finance Committee - Voting Session
3:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
3:15 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Canceled
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
The Spkr (Dept), et al

Renters' Rights and Stabilization Act of 2024

Created: 4/3/2024 12:49 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

House
Capital Budget Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 4/3/2024 11:57 AM
Capital Budget Subcommittee - Voting Session
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Created: 4/2/2024 5:18 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Voting Session
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Del Wilson

Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions (Tobacco Retail Modernization Act of 2024)
Del Boafo

Real Estate Brokers - Brokerage Agreements - Requirements
Dels Embry and Amprey

Security Guards – Use of Force Reporting – Health Care–Related Physical Interventions
The Pres (Admin), et al

Families Serve Act of 2024
Sen Gile, et al

Maryland Online Data Privacy Act of 2024
Sen Carter

Business Occupations and Professions - Security Guards - Use of Force Reporting, Standards, and Certifications
Sen Carozza, et al

Anaerobic Digestion Technology - Coordination and Guidance
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Economic Matters)
Sen Kramer

Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions (Tobacco Retail Modernization Act of 2024)

Created: 3/21/2024 3:37 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
All hearings are sponsor only unless otherwise indicated. Written testimony may be submitted.
Sen Folden, et al

Vehicle Laws - Military Vehicles - Registration and Operation
Oral testimony will be accepted on this bill.
Sen Folden

Motor Vehicles - Specially Designed Vintage Reproduction Registration Plates
Oral testimony will be accepted on this bill.
Sen Brooks, et al

Baltimore County - Speed Monitoring Systems - Residential Districts and Mailing of Citations
Sen Brooks

Agriculture – Invasive Plant Species – Regulation (Biodiversity and Agriculture Protection Act)
Sen Brooks

Fish and Wildlife - Endangered and Threatened Species - Definitions, Petitions, and Regulations
Sen McKay

Motor Vehicles – Recreational Vehicle Dealer Agreements
Sen McKay

Deep Creek Lake - Lower Lake Levels - Requirement and Impact Study
Sens Bailey and Hester

Special Chesapeake Bay and Coastal Sport Fishing License - Nonresidents - License Fee
Sens Bailey and Hester

Hunting - Nonresident Sika Deer Stamp - Fee Alteration
Sen Gallion

Fishing and Hunting Licenses and Trout Stamps - Complimentary Licenses and Stamp Exemption - Veterans Determined to Be Unemployable
Sen Corderman

Maryland Zero Emission Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Council - Membership and Reporting
Sen Guzzone

Human Services - Individuals With Disabilities and Service-Disabled Veterans Boating Fund
Sen Charles

Vehicle Laws - Automated Enforcement Citations and Notices - Mailing Addresses
Sen Elfreth, et al

Abandoned or Sunken Vessels and Waterway Improvement Fund Grants
Oral testimony will be accepted on this bill.
Sen Hester

Tree Expert Licenses - Application and Renewal Fee Alterations and Insurance Requirements
Sen Carter

Motor Vehicles - Motorcycles - Passenger Restrictions
Sen Gile, et al

Operating a Vessel While Under the Influence of Alcohol - Enforcement (Nick's Law)
Sen Klausmeier, et al

Shellfish Aquaculture - Harvest Hours
Sen Kramer

Agriculture - Roosters - Restrictions
Sen Hester

Environment - Delegated Authorities - Well and Septic Program Permits
(Removed - 3/25/2024 3:43 PM)
Sen Carozza, et al

Anaerobic Digestion Technology - Coordination and Guidance
(Removed - 3/25/2024 3:46 PM)

Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee - (Environment and Transportation Committee)
Canceled
Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee - Voting Session
12:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Environment Subcommittee - (Environment and Transportation Committee)
Created: 4/1/2024 4:51 PM
Environment Subcommittee - Work Session
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Created: 4/3/2024 11:46 AM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Voting Session
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
2:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD

Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - (Health and Government Operations Committee)
Created: 4/1/2024 3:30 PM
Health Occupations and Long-Term Care Subcommittee - Work Session
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
HB 354
HB 1263
(Added - 4/2/2024 4:40 PM)
SBs 236, 237, 238, 239, 240, 241, 242, 243, 257, and 718
SB 952
(Added - 4/2/2024 4:40 PM)

Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - (Health and Government Operations Committee)
Created: 3/28/2024 1:38 PM
Government Operations and Health Facilities Subcommittee - Work Session
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Subcommittee will begin at 1:30 pm.
SBs 280, 290, 292, 1007, and 1014
(Added - 3/29/2024 8:44 AM)
SB 1068
(Added - 4/2/2024 5:08 PM)
HB 1141
(Added - 4/2/2024 5:08 PM)
SBs 194, 280, 290, 292, 1007, and 1014
(Removed - 3/29/2024 8:44 AM)

Created: 4/2/2024 4:33 PM
Judiciary Committee - Voting Session
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
** Voting session start time subject to change **
Del Amprey

Prison Education Delivery Reform Commission
Sen Sydnor

Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sen McCray (BCA)

Criminal Law - Private Home Detention Monitoring - Notification
Sen Sydnor

Criminal Procedure - Committed Persons - Release Proceedings
Sen Hester, et al

Revenge Porn - Civil Action and Reporting Requirement
Sen Smith

Public Safety - Firearm Safety and Firearm Crimes
Del Phillips, et al

Civil Actions - Public Nuisances - Firearm Industry Members (Gun Industry Accountability Act of 2024)
Dels Simpson and Taylor

Child Support - Suspension of Driver's Licenses
Sen Muse

Child Support - Suspension of Driver's Licenses

Created: 4/3/2024 5:47 PM
Judiciary Committee - Work Session
5:50 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD

Other
Board of Public Works
Created: 10/25/2023 3:39 PM
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach the livestream link click here
10 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Fl, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting
(Added - 10/25/2023 3:43 PM)

Conference Committee
Canceled
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Senate-House Conference Committee on SB360, Budget Bill for Fiscal Year 2025, and SB362, Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024.

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission
Created: 3/27/2024 3:16 PM
10:00 AM - Atman-Glazer Building, Room 164 A&B, 45 Calvert St. , Annapolis, MD 21401
To view the meeting video, click here
Meeting ID: 872 5262 5910 Passcode: 699134 Dial-In #: 301-715-8592
In-person or virtual meeting of the Maryland Community Health Resources Commission (CHRC).

Click to return on the top page