Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 5/23/2024 3:35:53 PM
Monday, April 1, 2024
Senate
Created: 4/1/2024 1:51 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Voting Session
4:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

Created: 3/29/2024 5:36 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
5:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

House
Insurance and Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee - (Health and Government Operations Committee)
Created: 3/28/2024 3:54 PM
Insurance and Pharmaceuticals Subcommittee - Work Session
3:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
HBs 865 and 1376
SB 614

Created: 3/20/2024 1:45 PM
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
** Crossfiled bills will be SPONSOR ONLY. Senate bills without House crossfiles will receive a full, public hearing. **
Sen Watson, et al

Criminal Law - Organized Retail Theft
(Added - 3/21/2024 10:55 AM)
Sens Muse and Hettleman

Drunk Driving Offenses - Expungement and the Ignition Interlock System Program
Sen Hettleman, et al

Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding
(Jointly assigned to Judiciary\Health and Government Operations)
Sen Sydnor

Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sen Muse

Law Enforcement - Wellness Checks - Requirements (Gabriel's Law)
Sen Waldstreicher

Criminal Law - Theft - Mail and Arrow Key
Sen Muse

Criminal Procedure – Incompetency to Stand Trial Dismissal
Sen McCray (BCA)

Criminal Law - Private Home Detention Monitoring - Notification
Sen Sydnor

Criminal Procedure - Committed Persons - Release Proceedings
Sen Sydnor

Public Safety - Automatic License Plate Readers - Captured Plate Data Storage and Upload
Sen Hester, et al

Revenge Porn - Civil Action and Reporting Requirement
(Added - 3/21/2024 9:59 AM)
Sen Folden, et al

Public Safety - Police Accountability and Discipline - Summary Punishment
(Removed - 3/21/2024 4:54 PM)
Sen Folden, et al

Public Safety - Police Accountability - Time Limit for Filing Administrative Charges
(Removed - 3/21/2024 4:54 PM)

Created: 3/29/2024 7:15 PM
Judiciary Committee - Voting Session
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
** This voting session will begin immediately following the day's bill hearings. **
Sen Lam, et al

Legally Protected Health Care - Gender-Affirming Treatment
(Jointly assigned to Health and Government Operations\Judiciary)
Sen Hettleman, et al

Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding
(Jointly assigned to Judiciary\Health and Government Operations)

Other
Conference Committee
Created: 3/31/2024 8:00 PM
4:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Senate-House Conference Committee on SB360, Budget Bill for Fiscal Year 2025, and SB362, Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2024.

Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics
Created: 3/29/2024 4:25 PM
Work Session
5:45 PM - House Office Building, Room 142, Annapolis, MD
Work Session

Click to return on the top page