Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Day(s)

As of: 4/26/2025 11:23:31 AM
Friday, March 7, 2025
Senate
Created: 3/6/2025 2:29 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
9:00 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Created: 2/5/2025 12:06 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
9:00 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Charles County Senators

Charles County – Student Bus Transportation Providers – Provider Displacement
(Added - 2/19/2025 10:32 AM)
Sen Charles, et al

Higher Education - Religious Educational Institutions - Certificate of Approval
(Added - 2/13/2025 12:05 PM)
Howard County Senators

Howard County Board of Education - Board Member Terms and Compensation Commission Ho. Co. 2-25
(Added - 2/19/2025 1:23 PM)
Sen Henson

Legislative Scholarship Programs - Eligibility and Use - Real Estate Appraisal Program
(Added - 2/13/2025 12:05 PM)
Sen Love

Primary and Secondary Education - Student Technology and Social Media Resource Guide
Sen Ready

Children - Parental Rights - Educational Rights
Sen Lewis Young

Elementary and Secondary Education - Curriculum - Importance of Diversity
(Added - 2/7/2025 1:00 PM)
Sen Carozza, et al

Institutions of Higher Education - Dually Enrolled Students - Alterations
(Added - 2/13/2025 12:05 PM)
Sens Watson and Attar

Public Schools - Open Enrollment - Policies and Funding
(Jointly assigned to Education, Energy, and the Environment\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Hester

Education - Artificial Intelligence - Guidelines, Professional Development, and Task Force
Sens Brooks and Watson

Student Service Hours - Financial Literacy Course
Sponsor only testimony
Sen King

Primary and Secondary Education - Public School Employees - Salaries
(Removed - 2/27/2025 3:59 PM)

Canceled
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

House
Canceled
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Howard County Delegation

Columbia Association - Lease Requirements and Governing Documents Ho. Co. 14-25
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County - Speed Monitoring Systems - High-Risk Highways MC 17-25
Del Young, et al

Baltimore City - Stop Sign Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Mont Co Deleg and PG Co Deleg

Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Exemptions MC/PG 107-25
Charles County Delegation

Charles County - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Regulation and Enforcement

Canceled
Health and Government Operations Committee - Voting Session
11:30 AM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD

Canceled
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Del Kerr

Cybersecurity - Healthcare Ecosystem
Del Kerr

Massage Therapy - Continuing Education Requirements
Del Kerr

Workgroup to Study Implementation of a Statewide 3-1-1 Nonemergency Telephone System
Del Kaiser, et al

Morticians and Funeral Directors - Not-For-Profit Funeral Establishments
Del Fair, et al

Commission on Nondiscrimination - Establishment
Del Foley

Procurement - Advertising - Local News Organizations
Dels Vogel and Schmidt

Department of Information Technology – Maryland OneStop – Required State, County, and Municipal Information
Del D. Jones, et al

Constitutional Officers - Gender-Neutral Language
Del Bagnall, et al

Dental Services - Dental Hygienists in Schools and School-Based Health Centers and the Maryland Collaborative to Improve Children's Oral Health Through School-Based Programs
Dels Adams and Hutchinson

State Finance and Procurement - Retention Proceeds
Del Hill, et al

Physicians - Licensing - Internationally Trained Physicians
Del Wu

Cybersecurity – Standards, Compliance, and Audits – Alterations
Del Forbes

Cyber Maryland Program – Revisions

Other
Anne Arundel
Created: 1/10/2025 4:04 PM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Anne Arundel County Delegation Meeting

Baltimore City
Created: 1/27/2025 10:32 AM
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
To view the livestream on Facebook click here
Baltimore City House Delegation Weekly Meeting

Charles
Created: 1/10/2025 3:20 PM
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Charles County Delegation Meeting

Eastern Shore
Canceled
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Delegation Meeting

Southern Maryland
Canceled
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Southern Maryland Delegation Meeting

Click to return on the top page