Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 4/16/2024 10:32:40 PM
Friday, January 26, 2024
Senate
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/10/2024 3:55 PM
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:30 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Or immediately following session.

Health and Human Services Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/10/2024 3:55 PM
Health and Human Services Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:30 AM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Or immediately following session.

Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/10/2024 3:55 PM
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
11:30 AM - Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
12:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD

House
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 1/15/2024 4:17 PM
Health and Social Services Subcommittee - Briefing
12:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Agenda

Meeting Materials

Joint with the Health and Government Operations Committee Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee
Briefing on Home - and Community - Based Waiver Programs in the State

Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - (Health and Government Operations Committee)
Created: 1/16/2024 9:52 AM
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Briefing
12:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Joint with the Appropriations Health and Social Services Subcommittee
Briefing on Home - and Community - Based Waiver Programs in the State

Other
Anne Arundel
Created: 12/13/2023 9:55 AM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Anne Arundel County Delegation Meeting

Baltimore County
Created: 1/23/2024 2:48 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing: County Executive John A. Olszewski, Jr.
Bill Hearings: HB417
Bill Voting: HB0058, HB0108

Charles
Canceled
10:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Charles County Delegation

Eastern Shore
Created: 12/28/2023 8:38 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube

Frederick
Created: 1/16/2024 11:01 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Frederick County House and Senate Delegations Meeting

Maryland Economic Council
Created: 1/24/2024 8:29 AM
9:00 AM - Maryland Chamber of Commerce, Suite 100, 60 West Street, Annapolis, MD
All future meeting notices will be published on the Maryland Department of Commerce Website
Organizational meeting
Review of economic data

Montgomery
Created: 1/25/2024 1:57 PM
11:00 AM - Zoom Meeting
Discussion of legislation assigned to the Montgomery County House Delegation Safety Committee

Click to return on the top page