Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 4/20/2024 6:04:14 AM
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
Senate
Created: 1/3/2024 1:22 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Overview on Gambling
(Added - 1/3/2024 2:49 PM)

Created: 1/11/2024 4:37 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen West

Agriculture - Maryland Food and Agricultural Resiliency Mechanism Grant Program - Expansion
(Jointly assigned to Education, Energy, and the Environment\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Lewis Young

Agriculture - Confinement of Egg-Laying Hens in Commercial Egg Production - Prohibitions
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

Department of Agriculture - Licensing, Registration, Fees and Penalties, and Regulation
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

Certified Local Farm and Fish Program - Annual Waiver Reports - Alterations
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

Aquaculture - Placement of Shellfish, Bags, Nets, and Structures on Submerged Aquatic Vegetation - Extension
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

Commercial Northern Snakehead License - Gear
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

Aquaculture - Definition of Shellfish - Alteration
Sen Bailey

Fishing Licenses and Stamps - Fee Exemptions - Residents Eligible for Assistance Programs
Sen Bailey

Natural Resources - Northern Snakehead - Common Name
Sen Gallion

Soil Conservation Districts - Small Ponds - Plan Review Fees

Created: 1/4/2024 2:13 PM
Finance Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
1. Workers' Compensation Insurance 101
2. Update from the Prescription Drug Affordability Board

Created: 1/5/2024 3:53 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Breifing by the Council of State Governments on Trends on Violent Crime
Briefing Agenda
Briefing Materials

Created: 1/15/2024 1:23 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
3:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen McCray

Baltimore City - Arrest Warrants for Violation of Probation - Time Frame
Sen Carter

Courts - Jury Service - Disqualification
Sen West

Maryland Uniform Transfers to Minors Act - Transfers as Custodian for the Benefit of a Minor - Authorization of Court
Sen West

Estates and Trusts - Appointment of Personal Representative - Objections
Sen West

Estates and Trusts - Interested Person - Definition

House
Created: 1/5/2024 12:46 PM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Briefing on Trauma Funding in the State

Created: 1/5/2024 8:39 AM
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Chr APP (Dept)

Human Services – Food Supplement Program (Summer SNAP for Children Act)
Del Crosby

State Retirement and Pension System - Forfeiture of Benefits
Del Attar, et al

Education – Coaches – Mental Health Training
(Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Ways and Means)
Del Ebersole

Higher Education - Teacher Development and Retention Program - Definition
Del Amprey

Resources and Education for All Prisons (REAP) Act
Del Simpson

State Employee Rights and Protections - Personnel Actions and Harassment - Investigation of Complaints
Chr APP (Dept)

Maryland Environmental Service – Governance and Requirements
Dels Korman and J. Lewis

Transportation - WMATA Operating Assistance - Alteration (Maryland Metro Funding Act of 2024)
Chr APP (Dept)

State Retirement and Pension System - Immediate Vesting
(Removed - 1/7/2024 11:29 AM)
Del J. Lewis

Institutions of Higher Education – Admissions Standards – Prohibition on Consideration of Legacy Preference
(Removed - 1/15/2024 12:40 PM)
Del J. Lewis, et al

Arbitration Reform for State Employees Act of 2024
(Removed - 1/15/2024 12:40 PM)
Del Mangione

Transportation Investment Program - County Referendum - Authorization
(Removed - 1/22/2024 2:45 PM)
Del Amprey

Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Training Facilities With an Outdoor Firearm Range - Location
(Removed - 1/22/2024 3:49 PM)

Created: 1/11/2024 10:33 AM
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Chr ECM (Dept)

Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Earned Wage Access and Credit Modernization
Chr ECM (Dept)

Financial Institutions - Third-Party Service Providers - Examinations
Chr ECM (Dept)

Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Predatory Loan Prevention (True Lender Act)

Created: 1/17/2024 4:48 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Canceled
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities subcommittee briefing from the Cannabis Public Health Advisory Council

Created: 1/11/2024 3:01 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Bill agenda has been updated for the bill hearing.
Chr HGO (Dept)

Department of Natural Resources - Pay-For-Success Contracts - Procurement Exemption
Chr HGO (Dept)

State Government - Information Technology - Major Information Technology Development Projects
Del Boyce, et al

Department of the Environment - Study on Deathcare and Funeral Practices
Del Kerr

State Contracts - Prohibited Provisions
(Added - 1/12/2024 1:07 PM)
Del Kerr

State Procurement - Maryland State Board of Contract Appeals - Attorney's Fees
(Added - 1/12/2024 1:07 PM)
Chr HGO (Dept)

Physicians and Allied Health Professions - Reorganization and Revisions
Del Pruski

Maryland Commission on Veterans and Military Families
Del Bouchat, et al

Commission to Study African American Civil War Soldiers in Maryland
Del Foley

Fossil Fuel-Powered Lawn and Garden Care Equipment - State Purchase, Use, and Contracts - Prohibition

Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - (Health and Government Operations Committee)
Created: 1/10/2024 5:11 PM
Public Health and Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee - Briefing
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Cannabis Public Health Advisory Council

Canceled
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
DLS 2024 Fiscal Briefing
Department of Legislative Services

Created: 1/10/2024 5:31 PM
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Del Crosby

Criminal Law - Indecent Exposure Within the Presence of a Minor
Del Attar

Criminal Procedure - Warrantless Arrest - Straw Purchase Participant
Del Grammer, et al

Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Quotas (Community-Oriented Policing Act)
Dels Rosenberg and Kipke

Crimes - Interfering With a Legislative Proceeding
Del Fraser-Hidalgo

Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility
Del Pasteur

Correctional Services - Inmate Employment - Agricultural Work
Del Bartlett

Criminal Law – Sexual Solicitation of a Minor Through Child Pornography – Prohibition
Dels Pippy and Simpson

Criminal Law - Revenge Porn - Visual Representation
Del Hill

Criminal Law - Interference With a Public Safety Answering Point - Penalties

Created: 12/12/2023 12:15 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Fiscal Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services
Agenda
Briefing Materials

Created: 1/2/2024 1:15 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the Bureau of Revenue Estimates
Agenda

Briefing Materials

Other
No hearings scheduled for today
Click to return on the top page