Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 4/20/2024 6:13:16 AM
Thursday, January 18, 2024
Senate
Created: 1/9/2024 7:23 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
12:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Chr B&T (Dept)

Department of Natural Resources - Pay-For-Success Contracts - Procurement Exemption
Chr B&T (Dept)

Sports Wagering - Sports Wagering Assistance Fund - Repeal
Sen Jackson

Economic Development - Tourism Zones - Designation and Benefits
Chr B&T (Dept)

Real Property Assessments - Revaluation of Property on Transfer After Appeal
Sen Gile, et al

Property Tax - Credit for Dwelling House of Disabled Veterans - Alterations
Sen Klausmeier

Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officer or Rescue Worker - Alterations
Sen Klausmeier

Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums (Long-Term Care Relief Act of 2024)
Sen Brooks

Property Tax Credit – Retail Service Station Conversions
Sens McCray and Lam

Tobacco Tax Stamp Refunds - Loss Due to Theft
Sen Hershey

School Construction - Local Cost-Share - Alterations
Sen Salling

State Procurement - Preferences - Historically Underutilized Business Zone Businesses
Sen Muse

Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Local Impact Grants - Town of Forest Heights
Sen Ellis

Transportation - Consolidated Transportation Program - Categorization and Equitable Distribution of Projects
Sen Ellis

Charles County Public Library - Imagination Library Program - Funding
Sens Hayes and M. Washington

State Procurement - Maryland Correctional Enterprises - Waiver
Chr B&T (Dept)

Natural Resources - Maryland State Parks - Funds and Plan Alterations
(Removed - 1/12/2024 11:21 AM)
Sen Kelly

Real Property - Transfer to Heir - Exemption From Prepayment
(Removed - 1/18/2024 10:08 AM)

Created: 1/5/2024 1:09 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Briefing on Solar Energy - Agenda
For questions regarding this briefing, please contact Alexis Foxworth at 410-841-3661.
(Added - 1/9/2024 12:01 PM)

Created: 1/12/2024 2:56 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
3:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

State Government - Deputy Secretary of State - Title
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

State Board for Professional Engineers - Engineer Members - Qualifications
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

State Government - Information Technology - Major Information Technology Development Projects
Sen Gile, et al

Maryland Commission on Veterans and Military Families
Sen M. Washington

Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing - Deafblind Co-Navigation Services Program - Established
(Removed - 1/15/2024 10:23 AM)

Created: 1/18/2024 10:04 AM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Voting Session
4:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD

Created: 1/8/2024 4:02 PM
Finance Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Maryland Department of Health briefing on the health care workforce and health occupations boards

Created: 1/8/2024 4:30 PM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
2:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Chr FIN (Dept)

State Board of Occupational Therapy Practice – Sunset Extension
Chr FIN (Dept)

State Board of Examiners in Optometry – Sunset Extension
Chr FIN (Dept)

State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Behavior Analyst Advisory Committee - Sunset Extension
Chr FIN (Dept)

State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners - Sunset Extension

Created: 1/17/2024 10:00 AM
Finance Committee - Voting Session
2:30 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Chr FIN (Dept)

Occupational Safety and Health Advisory Board – Sunset Extension
Chr FIN (Dept)

State Acupuncture Board – Sunset Extension
Chr FIN (Dept)

State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Sunset Extension
Chr FIN (Dept)

State Board of Dietetic Practice – Sunset Extension
Chr FIN (Dept)

Maryland Community Health Resources Commission – Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation

Created: 1/5/2024 3:53 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Briefing on the Contributing Factors of Chronic Truancy in the Maryland Public School System
Agenda
Briefing Materials

House
Public Safety and Administration Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 1/5/2024 12:39 PM
Public Safety and Administration Subcommittee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 145, Annapolis, MD
Update from Governor’s Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services on the Victims of Crime Act

Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - (Appropriations Committee)
Created: 1/5/2024 12:34 PM
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Senior Institutions of Higher Education Update on Affirmative Action post Students for Fair Admissions Inc. v. University of North Carolina and Students for Fair Admissions Inc. v. President & Fellows of Harvard College

Created: 1/10/2024 4:21 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Department of Information Technology Overview
Artificial Intelligence in Healthcare
(Added - 1/15/2024 2:19 PM)
Artificial Technology in Healthcare
(Removed - 1/15/2024 2:19 PM)

Created: 12/18/2023 11:37 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the State Board of Elections
Agenda

Created: 12/20/2023 11:53 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the Maryland Lottery and Gaming Control Agency and the Center for Excellence on Problem Gambling
Agenda

Briefing Materials

MD Lottery & Gaming Control Agency iGaming in MD Report

MD Center of Excellence on Problem Gambling Annual Report

Other
Blueprint for Maryland's Future Accountability and Implementation Board
Created: 1/4/2024 9:39 AM
1:00 PM - Virtual Meeting
The video link, agenda, and meeting materials will be posted prior to the meeting. For further information click here
Board Meeting

Harford
Created: 1/16/2024 12:29 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Weekly Meeting

No. 2 - Carroll and Frederick Counties
Created: 1/11/2024 2:12 PM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Delegation meeting to vote on local bills and local bond initiatives.

Click to return on the top page