Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 4/20/2024 6:09:16 AM
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
Senate
Created: 1/9/2024 7:23 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Chr B&T (Dept)

Property Tax - Submission of Building Permits to Supervisor of Assessments - Estimated Construction Cost
Chr B&T (Dept)

Property Tax Assessment - Appeals to Maryland Tax Court - Filing Fee
Chr B&T (Dept)

Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Application - Attestation of Gross Income
Chr B&T (Dept)

Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Application Filing Deadline - Extension for Homeowner Protection Program Enrollees
Chr B&T (Dept)

State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Office of the Director - Administrative Expenses
Sen Brooks

Income Tax - Senior Credit - Alterations
Sen Benson

Income Tax – Caregiver Tax Credit
Sen Watson

State Department of Education - Driver Education and Career and Technical Education - Funding (Driver Education and Career Education Act of 2024)
Sen Ellis

College of Southern Maryland - Funding and Responsibilities - La Plata Pool
Sen Kagan

Green and Renewable Energy for Nonprofit Organizations Loan Program and Fund
Sen Jackson

Workgroup to Study the Fiscal and Operational Viability of Public-Private Partnerships for Calvert County Public Schools
Sen McCray

University of Baltimore - Schaefer Center for Public Policy - Funding
Sen McCray

Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program - State Supplement
Sen McCray

Qualifying Nonprofit Organizations - Training and Reentry Services - Funding
Sen McCray

Arbitration Reform for State Employees Act of 2024
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Finance)
Sen Hayes

Community Development Administration - Live Near Your School Program - Funding and Extension
Sen A. Washington

Education - Public School Stadium Grant Program and Study - Established
Sen A. Washington

State Finance - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Education, Energy, and the Environment)

Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 1/9/2024 6:59 PM
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - Briefing
12:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Briefing on Inmate Healthcare

Created: 1/5/2024 1:09 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Briefing on Artificial Intelligence - Agenda
For questions regarding this briefing, please contact Alexis Foxworth at 410-841-3661.
(Added - 1/9/2024 12:01 PM)

Created: 1/10/2024 12:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Bill Hearing
3:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Hettleman, et al

Education – Coaches – Mental Health Training
Sen Ellis

Public Schools - Inclusive and Diverse English Language Arts - Development of Content Standards and Implementation
Sen Salling

County Boards of Education - Student Cellular Phone Use - Policy Required
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

Libraries - Regional Resource Centers - Governing Board Membership
Chr Education, Energy, and the Environmen

County Public Libraries - Overdue Library Materials - Minors
Sen Augustine

Education - Provision of Maryland Youth Crisis Hotline Telephone Number - Alteration
Sen Gallion

County Boards of Education - Hearing Notices and Bid Advertisements - Electronic Posting
Sen Hester

Public and Nonpublic Schools - Auto-Injectable Epinephrine and Bronchodilators - Use, Availability, Training, and Policies

Created: 1/4/2024 2:13 PM
Finance Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Update from the Maryland Insurance Administration and Maryland Health Benefit Exchange

Created: 1/5/2024 3:53 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Briefing: Medical Perspectives on Gun Violence and Gun Violence Prevention
Agenda
Briefing Materials

House
Created: 1/5/2024 12:29 PM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Update on State Employment and Recommendations from the Taskforce on the Modernization of the State Personnel Management System

Created: 1/11/2024 10:33 AM
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Update on FAMLI Agenda

Created: 1/10/2024 10:54 AM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Created: 1/10/2024 4:18 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
HSCRC Total Cost of Care Model, AHEAD Update
Emergency Department Wait Times
Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities Update
(Added - 1/17/2024 9:59 AM)
Office of Minority Health and Health Disparities Update
(Removed - 1/17/2024 9:59 AM)

Created: 1/5/2024 12:47 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Chr W&M (Dept)

Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Alterations
Chr W&M (Dept)

Sports Wagering - Sports Wagering Assistance Fund - Repeal
Chr W&M (Dept)

Real Property Assessments – Revaluation of Property on Transfer After Appeal
Chr W&M (Dept)

Property Tax - Submission of Building Permits to Supervisor of Assessments - Estimated Construction Cost
Chr W&M (Dept)

Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Application Filing Deadline - Extension for Homeowner Protection Program Enrollees
Del Boyce

Election Law - Party and Elected Public Offices - Prohibition
Del Cardin

Sports Wagering Campaign Contributions Parity Act of 2024
Del Guyton

Public Schools - Lifesaver Schools Program - Establishment
Del Acevero

Commission on History, Culture, and Civics in Education
Del Mangione

Workgroup to Study School Bus Safety (Maryland School Bus Safety Act of 2024)
(Removed - 1/5/2024 1:10 PM)

Other
Board of Public Works
Created: 10/25/2023 10:55 AM
10:00 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
11:30 AM - Virtual/In Person Meeting
To reach the livestream link click here
10 AM-Governor's Reception Room, 2nd Fl, State House, 100 State Circle, Annapolis
For participation details, please contact BPW staff at email.bpw@maryland.gov
General Meeting

Howard
Created: 1/11/2024 10:27 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Howard County House and Senate Delegations Meeting
Meeting Agenda
Meeting on proposed local bills and bonds.

Click to return on the top page