Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 5/16/2022 2:10:18 PM
Thursday, January 13, 2022
Senate
Created: 1/7/2022 4:39 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Organization Meeting followed by
Briefing on the Economy - Dan White, Director, Moody's Analytics

Created: 1/11/2022 4:07 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
10:45 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting

Canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing from Maryland Department of Health on Covid Vaccine spoilage.
Briefing from the Maryland Department of Health and the Department of Information Technology on the cybersecurity hack of MDH.
A vote to close: To discuss cybersecurity for which public discussion would constitute a risk to network security information.

Created: 1/3/2022 1:42 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Joint Hearing with the Health and Government Operations Committee
Briefing from the Maryland Department of Health and the Department of Information Technology on the cybersecurity hack of MDH.
A vote to close: To discuss cybersecurity for which public discussion would constitute a risk to network security information.
Briefing from Maryland Department of Health on Covid Vaccine spoilage.

Created: 1/6/2022 12:58 PM
Finance Committee
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Organizational Meeting

Created: 1/6/2022 12:58 PM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Chr FIN (Dept)

Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Apprenticeship and Training Council - Sunset Extension
Chr FIN (Dept)

State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors – Sunset Extension
Chr FIN (Dept)

Office of Cemetery Oversight – Sunset Extension

Created: 1/5/2022 2:29 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
JPR Committee Organizational Meeting

Created: 1/5/2022 2:29 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Chr JPR (Dept)

Vehicle Laws - Rear-Facing Child Safety Seats - Requirement
Chr JPR (Dept)

Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses and Identification Cards – Temporary Renewal
Chr JPR (Dept)

Criminal Law - Assault of a Public Transportation Service Provider - Penalties
Chr JPR (Dept)

Department of Juvenile Services - Facilities - J. DeWeese Carter Center
Chr JPR (Dept)

Controlled Substances - Schedules
Chr JPR (Dept)

Evidence - Approval of Breath and Blood Tests for Alcohol, Drugs, or Controlled Dangerous Substances
Chr JPR (Dept)

Children in Need of Assistance – Custody and Guardianship and Review Hearings
Chr JPR (Dept)

Child Abuse and Neglect - Disclosure of Reports and Records
Chr JPR (Dept)

Correctional Officer - Death Benefit - Eligibility
Chr JPR (Dept)

Correctional Officer - Employment - Age Requirement

House
Created: 1/3/2022 3:08 PM
Appropriations Committee
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
11:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Organizational Meeting

Created: 1/11/2022 2:32 PM
Economic Matters Committee
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Organizational Meeting

Created: 1/6/2022 3:28 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube

Created: 1/6/2022 1:42 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Lehman, et al

Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Del Lehman, et al

Department of Agriculture - Spay/Neuter Fund - Extension and Report
Del Watson, et al

Condominiums – Disclosures to Unit Owners and Prohibited Provisions in Instruments
Del Fraser-Hidalgo, et al

Maryland Agricultural Commission – Hemp Industry Member
Del Holmes

Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide
Del Holmes

Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings
Del Carr

Vehicle Laws – Intersections – Prohibited Acts

Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - (Environment and Transportation Committee)
Created: 1/11/2022 12:39 PM
Motor Vehicle and Transportation Subcommittee - Work Session
2:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Created: 1/6/2022 2:24 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee
11:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Health and Government Operations Organizational Meeting

Created: 12/17/2021 1:06 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Briefing from the Maryland Department of Health and the Department of Information Technology on the cybersecurity hack of MDH
Vote to close to discuss cybersecurity for which public discussion would constitute a risk to network security information
(Added - 12/22/2021 5:38 PM)
Briefing from Maryland Department of Health on Covid Vaccine spoilage
(Added - 12/31/2021 3:38 PM)
Briefing from MDH on Covid Vaccine spoilage
(Removed - 12/31/2021 3:38 PM)

Created: 1/7/2022 3:26 PM
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Judiciary Committee Organizational Meeting

Created: 1/6/2022 1:59 PM
Ways and Means Committee
12:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Organizational Meeting

Created: 1/4/2022 3:57 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Boyce

Election Law – Party and Elected Public Offices – Prohibition
Please Note: Testimony is SPONSOR ONLY.
(Added - 1/4/2022 3:59 PM)
Del Brooks

Income Tax - Credit for Energy Efficiency Upgrades - Passive Houses
Del Brooks

Income Tax – Healthy Indoor Air Quality Tax Credit
Del Brooks

Property Tax Credit for Disabled Veterans - Established
(Added - 1/4/2022 3:59 PM)
Del Brooks

Income Tax – Subtraction Modification for Veterans
Del Brooks

Income Tax – Subtraction Modification for Centenarians

Other
Harford
Created: 1/6/2022 11:32 AM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Weekly-Harford County House Delegation Meeting

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Created: 12/16/2021 4:45 PM
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
To watch the livestream click here
and click on "Stream" under the appropriate date.
For additional meeting information click here
Public virtual meeting to discuss normal IAC business.

Click to return on the top page