Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 4/16/2024 10:05:51 PM
Thursday, January 11, 2024
Senate
Created: 1/5/2024 6:38 AM
Budget and Taxation Committee
11:00 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Organization Meeting

Created: 1/5/2024 1:55 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting

Created: 1/4/2024 12:10 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee - Briefing
1:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Energy Capacity Briefing
For questions regarding this briefing, please contact Alexis Foxworth at 410-841-3661.
(Added - 1/9/2024 12:01 PM)
Energy Capacity Briefing
(Removed - 1/4/2024 12:12 PM)

Created: 1/4/2024 2:13 PM
Finance Committee
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting

Created: 1/4/2024 2:13 PM
Finance Committee - Briefing
1:30 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Update from the Maryland Health Care Commission

Created: 1/5/2024 3:53 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
JPR Member and Staff Orientation

Created: 1/5/2024 3:53 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee
2:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
ITO Overview for members and staff on the Seante Floor System

Created: 1/8/2024 10:47 AM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
2:30 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Jackson

Family Law - Marriage Ceremony - Designation of Deputy Clerk
Sen West

Orphans’ Court Judges – Elections
Sen West

Orphans' Court Judges - Restriction on Practicing Law

House
Created: 1/4/2024 12:14 PM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
10:30 AM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting

Created: 1/9/2024 2:18 PM
Economic Matters Committee
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting

Created: 12/28/2023 2:45 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD

Created: 1/8/2024 10:06 AM
Health and Government Operations Committee
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting

Created: 12/19/2023 3:00 PM
Judiciary Committee - Overview
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting

Created: 1/5/2024 10:16 AM
Ways and Means Committee
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting

Other
Harford
Created: 1/8/2024 5:05 PM
9:00 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Regular Weekly Meeting

School Construction, Interagency Commission on
Canceled
9:00 AM - Virtual Meeting
To watch the livestream, click here and click on "Stream" under the appropriate date.
Additional meeting information will be available at https://mdschoolconstruction.org
Public virtual meeting to discuss normal IAC business.

Washington
Created: 1/10/2024 12:17 PM
8:30 AM - Zoom / YouTube
Delegation Meeting

Click to return on the top page