Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB1107 - Housing and Community Development - Study on the Establishment of a Homeless Shelter Licensing Program

Education, Energy, and the Environment 3/12/2024 1:00:00 PM
Environment and Transportation 3/26/2024 1:00:00 PM
As of: 7/20/2024 2:27:02 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Washington, M., Senator Washington, M. FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
EEE
Mauer, William FAV No Testimony EEE
Izer, Aimee The Hope Center UNF Senate Bill 1107 Testimony Letter.pdf EEE
Walker, Laurel UNF Senate Bill 1107.pdf EEE
Shycoff, Isabella FAV Written Testimony MDOA HB577 - DHCD Homeless Shelt EEE
Meyerovich, Mark UNF No Testimony EEE
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV No Testimony EEE
Butchko, Dominic Maryland Association of Counties (MACo) UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
SB1107-EEE_MACo_OPP.pdf
EEE
izer, Terry Four States Christian Mission/ The Hope Center UNF SB 1107 Testimony.pdf EEE
mcavoy, vince UNF No Testimony EEE
Shapiro, Melanie Maryland Network Against Domestic Violence FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 1107_MNADV_FWA.pdf
EEE
Reynolds-Dominguez, Camila FreeState Justice FAV No Testimony EEE
Richardson, Cristi Wicomico Public Library FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
Untitled document (9).pdf
EEE
Meister, Danielle Department of Housing and Community Development FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB1107_DHCD_SUPPORT.pdf
EEE
Browning, Jeremy Maryland Commission on LGBTQIA+ Affairs FAV Favorable Testimony SB1107 3.12.2024.pdf EEE
Duvall, Richard Law Office of Richard M. Duvall UNF HALO 3.11.24 LTR Senator Feldman.pdf EEE
Harris, Mrs. FAV No Testimony EEE
Blinder , Lee Trans Maryland FAV Support SB 1107 - Trans Maryland.pdf EEE
Baylor, Gregory Alliance Defending Freedom INFO Virtual - Oral Testimony
2024.03.11 ADF Ltr re MD S.B. 1107.pdf
EEE
Themelis, Nina Mayor's Office of Government Relations FWA HB0492-ET-FWA.pdf EEE
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-12-2024 at 855 AM EEE
Senator Washington, M., Senator Washington, M. FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
ENT
Williams, Peggy UNF No Testimony ENT
Meyerovich, Mark UNF No Testimony ENT
Arshavsky, Svetlana UNF No Testimony ENT
Lang, Alan UNF No Testimony ENT
Hollywood, Nicole FAV HB577_SB1107 Housing and Community Development - H ENT
Elbourn, James UNF No Testimony ENT
Browning, Jeremy Maryland Commission on LGBTQIA+ Affairs FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Favorable Testimony SB1107 3.26.2024.pdf
ENT
Diefenbach, Linda UNF No Testimony ENT
Hudson, Lee Delaware-Maryland Synod, ELCA FAV No Testimony ENT
DOrazio, Peter Year UNF No Testimony ENT
Cook, Chuck DHCD FAV DHCD_FAV_SB_1107 ENT
Click to return on the top page