Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB1009 - Task Force on Responsible Use of Natural Psychedelic Substances

Finance 3/14/2024 1:00:00 PM
Health and Government Operations 3/27/2024 1:00:00 PM
As of: 7/17/2024 4:27:26 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Feldman, Senator Feldman FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Feldman, Brian FWA Amendment_SB1009_5F92C232-5FE5-475F-BF82-1D44B1135
UpdatedAmendment_SB1009_52F916A6-B195-4BDF-BD73-FE
FIN
Garrison, Andrew Maryland Cannabis Administration FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
FAV - SB1009 - MCA.docx.pdf
FIN
Carrington, Darrell Carrington & Associates, LLC FWA Carrington 2024 sb1008 hb548 psy drug task force.p FIN
Rhead, John FAV Testimony MD senate.pdf FIN
Martin, Dan Mental Health Association of Maryland FAV SB1009_MHAMD_FAV.pdf FIN
Hobelmann, Joseph Maryland-DC Society of Addiction Medicine FWA testimony SB 1009 psychedelics.pdf FIN
Love, William UNF No Testimony FIN
Price, Suzanne Concerned Citizen UNF No Testimony FIN
Hamilton, Timothy FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB1009 Testimony - Tim Hamilton.pdf
FIN
Arnold, Tyahna Ashlar Government Relations FAV SB1009 Garden FAV.pdf FIN
Kabara, Ilona FAV SB1009.pdf FIN
Williams, Peggy UNF No Testimony FIN
Servetnick, Deborah ServeMedicine FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB1009 FAV.pdf
FIN
Going, Lauren FAV Supporting HB0548.pdf FIN
Wisdom, Thomas FAV Supporting SB1009.pdf FIN
Atkins, Robert UNF No Testimony FIN
Lewis, Shanetha Veterans Initiative 22 FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
FIN
Brewer, Eileen Clusterbusters FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Eileen Brewer Testimony SB 1009.pdf
FIN
Sterling, Eric FWA Virtual - Oral Testimony
Psychedelic use SB1009 Mar 14.pdf
FIN
HARRISON, JOHN Marylanders for Beneficial Psychedelics FAV Harrison supporting SB1009.pdf FIN
Treloar Jr, Richard Myself FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
RichardTreloarTestimony.pdf
FIN
Coop, Andrew FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
A Coop Testimony 2024 Senate.pdf
FIN
Fox, Valory FAV SB1009_Fox_FAV-2024-03-14.pdf FIN
Huslage, Mark Baltimore Psychedelic Society FAV SB1009Testimony.pdf FIN
Larson-Rabin, Zachary FAV Testimony for SB 1009.pdf FIN
Vernon, Michael UNF No Testimony FIN
mcavoy, vince UNF UNF on SB1009 vmcavoy.pdf FIN
Johnson, Amy Big Tree Counseling, LLC FAV SB 1009.pdf FIN
Lang, Alan UNF No Testimony FIN
Glassman, Hannah Marylanders for Beneficial Psychedelics FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
FAV Testimony for SB1009-Task Force on Responsible
FIN
Selleh, David FAV FAV SB1009 - David Selleh.pdf FIN
brenner, loretta UNF No Testimony FIN
Williams, Scott Marylanders for Beneficial Psychedelics FAV Scott Williams Testimony.pdf FIN
Wexler, Pamela wexlerESQ LLC FAV 2023_0313_SB1009 SEN FIN_ WEXLER.pdf FIN
Davis, Courtney Office of Social Equity FAV OSE Support for Task Force on Responsible Use of N FIN
Peacock, Brian Marylanders for Beneficial Psychedelics FAV 2024-03-13 Dr. Brian Peacock - Written Testimony S FIN
Marinelli, Nicholas FAV SB1009 testimony.pdf FIN
Thomas, Tegy FAV SB1009.pdf FIN
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-14-2024 at 708 AM FIN
Senator Feldman, Senator Feldman FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HGO
Tompsett, Thomas Harris Jones & Malone FAV SB 1009 - Support - MPS WPS - House.pdf HGO
Senator Feldman, Senator Feldman FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HGO
Click to return on the top page