Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0894 - Baltimore City - Control Over Powers of Police Commissioner

Judicial Proceedings 3/5/2024 1:00:00 PM
Judiciary 3/28/2024 1:00:00 PM
As of: 7/24/2024 8:43:21 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Carter, Senator Carter FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Dews, Christopher Center for Urban Families (CFUF) FAV No Testimony JPR
Brown, Renaud FAV No Testimony JPR
Ditz, Toby FAV SB894 (LC) DITZ Favorable.pdf JPR
Kelly, Raymond Citizens Policing Project FAV No Testimony JPR
Zinker, Hannah FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB894_HannahZinker_FAV.pdf
JPR
Conway, Councilman Mark Councilman Mark Conway FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB894 Testimony (Councilman Mark Conway _ Favorabl
JPR
Keipper, Lindsay Showing Up for Racial Justice- Baltimore FAV SB894 Local control.docx.pdf JPR
Britt, Adiena N/A FAV No Testimony JPR
Palmisano, Erica SURJ Baltimore FAV SB894 Local control.pdf JPR
Shillenn, Rebecca SURJ Baltimore FAV SB894 Local control Testimony Template.pdf JPR
Ford, John FAV SB894 Support John Ford.pdf JPR
Lewitus, Eric FAV SB894_EricLewitus_FAVORABLE.pdf JPR
Lewitus, Sarah FAV SB894_SarahLewitus_FAVORABLE.pdf JPR
Nemphos, Christina FAV SB894 Local control CLB.pdf JPR
Cramer, David SURJBaltimore FAV SB894 Local control Testimony (Cramer).pdf JPR
Roth, Kristina NAACP LDF FAV 2024-03-04 Senate JPR- LDF Testimony in Support of JPR
Johnson, Sarah FAV SB894 Local control_Favorable.pdf JPR
Columbus, Theresa N/A FAV SB894 Local control Testimony Template.docx.pdf JPR
Carter, Jill FWA SB 894 Control Over Powers of Police Commssioner
SB0894 Testimony.pdf
JPR
Powell, Holly Showing Up for Racial Justice (SURJ) FAV SB894 Local control Testimony Template.pdf JPR
Juberg, Arielle FAV SB0894_ArielleJuberg_Fav.pdf JPR
Eckel, Rianna SURJ Baltimore FAV Eckel FAV SB894 Local control Testimony Template.p JPR
Ogurick, Arlene FAV SB894_AreleneOgurick_FAV.pdf JPR
Themelis, Nina Mayor's Office of Government Relations FAV SB894 - BCHD - FAV.pdf JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-5-2024 at 853 AM JPR
Jill Carter, Senator FAV No Testimony JPR
Senator Carter, Senator Carter FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Lewitus, Eric FAV SB894_EricLewitus_FAVORABLE.pdf JUD
Lewitus, Sarah FAV SB894_SarahLewitus_FAVORABLE.pdf JUD
Palmisano, Erica SURJ Baltimore FAV SB894 Local Control - in the House.pdf JUD
Juberg, Arielle FAV SB0894_ArielleJuberg_Fav_3.26.24.pdf JUD
Ford, John FAV SB894 Local control - in the House.pdf JUD
Nemphos, Christina FAV SB894 Local control CBell.docx.pdf JUD
Powell, Holly Showing Up for Racial Justice (SURJ) FAV SB894 Local control - in the House.pdf JUD
Zinker, Hannah FAV HannahZinker_Crossfile.pdf JUD
Roth, Kristina NAACP LDF FAV 2024-03-26 SB 894 House Judiciary Testimony_Suppor JUD
Themelis, Nina Mayor's Office of Government Relations FAV SB0894-JUD-SUPP.pdf JUD
Wilkins, Katherine SURJ FAV SB894 Local control - in the House.pdf JUD
Themelis, Nina Mayor's Office of Government Relations FAV SB0894-JUD-SUPP.pdf JUD
Click to return on the top page