Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0884 - Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child Support Arrearages - Exception

Judicial Proceedings 3/10/2022 1:00:00 PM
Judiciary 3/31/2022 1:00:00 PM
As of: 10/1/2022 3:13:29 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Watson, Senator Watson FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Johnson, Sarah FAV SB 884 - Repeal Driver’s License Suspensions for L JPR
Fry, Donald Greater Baltimore Committee FAV SB0884 - 3.10.22 -- Driver's Licenses - Suspension JPR
Dews, Christopher JOTF FAV Oral Testimony
2021 UBALT - DL Suspension Stats.pdf
SB0884_FAV_JOTF.docx.pdf
SB884_FAV_SIGNON.docx.pdf
JPR
Watson, Ron FWA SB 884 Senator Watson FWA.pdf
SB0884-633624-01.pdf
JPR
Wolfson, Kate Center for Urban Families FAV 2022-03-10 CFUF Testimony - SB884.pdf JPR
Ruth, Laure Women's Law Center of Maryland, Inc. FWA SB 884 - FWA - Women's Law Center of MD.pdf JPR
Todd, Tamara FAV SB 884 - Repeal Driver’s License Suspensions for L JPR
Lewis, Amir FAV Oral Testimony
SB884_Fav_Wanda Dale.pdf
JPR
Mehu, Natasha Mayor's Office of Government Relations FAV SB0884-JPR-FAV.pdf JPR
McDermott, Eliza University of Baltimore School of Law's Civil Advocacy Clinic FAV Oral Testimony
Final Testimony_CAC_SB 884.pdf
JPR
Benn, Sarahia FAV SB0884-Fav Testimony POLICY FOUNDATION OF MARYLAND JPR
Sledge, Rachel INFO SB884_DHS_LOI.pdf JPR
Juberg, Arielle FAV SB0884_Arielle Juberg_FAV.pdf JPR
Darby, Tim FAV No Testimony JPR
Palmisano, Erica SURJ Baltimore FAV SB 884 - Repeal Driver’s License Suspensions for L JPR
Yoder, Daryl FAV SB 884 - Repeal Driver’s License Suspensions for L JPR
Stern, Isadora FAV SB884_MCRC_FAV (2022) (1).pdf JPR
Powell, Holly Showing Up for Racial Justice (SURJ) FAV SB 884 - Repeal Driver’s License Suspensions for L JPR
Wilkins, Katherine FAV SB 884 - Repeal Driver’s License Suspensions for L JPR
Smeton, Jonathan SURJ Baltimore FAV SB 884 - Repeal Driver’s License Suspensions for L JPR
Shillenn, Rebecca FAV SB 884 - Repeal Driver’s License Suspensions for L JPR
Badeker, Melissa SURJ Baltimore FAV Badeker SB 884 - Repeal Driver?s License Suspensio JPR
Parvis, Lindsay Family & Juvenile Law Section - MSBA FWA Oral Testimony
SB 884 - Driver's Licenses - Suspension for Child
JPR
Bogdan, Henry Maryland Nonprofits FAV SB 884 to JPR - Mar 10 - SUPPORT License Suspens JPR
Hanson - Mundell, Nicole Out for Justice FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Bensky, Stacy Maryland Legal Aid FAV Oral Testimony
SB 884 Testimony.pdf
JPR
Dale, Wanda JOTF - Witness FAV Oral Testimony
SB884_FAV_WandaDale.docx.pdf
JPR
McWilliams, Elaina Out for Justice FAV SB0884_FAV_KeenaMoodie.docx.pdf JPR
Quarles, Antoin Helping Oppressed People Excel (H.O.P.E.) FAV SB0884_FAV_HOPE.docx.pdf JPR
Freeman, Iman People's Commission to Decriminalize MD FAV SB0884_FAV_DecrimMD.docx.pdf JPR
Johnson, Qiana Life After Release FAV No Testimony JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-10-2022 at 1021 AM JPR
Senator Watson, Senator Watson FAV Oral Testimony JUD
Sledge, Rachel INFO SB884_DHS_LOI.pdf JUD
Dews, Christopher JOTF FAV Oral Testimony
2021 UBALT - DL Suspension Stats (5).pdf
Abell Foundation Report (See page 8).pdf
SB0884_FAV_JOTF_HV.pdf
JUD
Lewis, Amir FWA Oral Testimony JUD
Kemerer, Hannibal Office of Attorney General FAV 2022-03-31 SB 884 (Revised Support).pdf JUD
Mehu, Natasha Mayor's Office of Government Relations FAV SB0884-JUD-FAV.pdf JUD
Hanson-Mundell, Nicole FAV OFJ SB884_FAV.pdf JUD
Fry, Donald Greater Baltimore Committee FAV SB0884 - 3.31.22 -- (Opposite) Driver's Licenses - JUD
Watson, Ron FAV Henson 03 21 22.pdf
SB 884 Senator Watson FAV(v2).pdf
JUD
Bensky, Stacy JOTF FAV Oral Testimony JUD
McDermott, Eliza JOTF - Witness FAV Oral Testimony JUD
Click to return on the top page