Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0741 - COVID-19 Testing, Contact Tracing, and Vaccination Act of 2021

Finance 2/24/2021 1:00:00 PM
Health and Government Operations 3/30/2021 1:30:00 PM
As of: 4/24/2024 12:02:49 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Rosapepe, Senator Rosapepe FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
mcavoy, vince UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Fidler, Sara Maryland Independent College and University Association INFO SB 741 MICUA Letter of Info.pdf FIN
Heavner, Brad Maryland PIRG FAV SB741 COVID_Maryland PIRG FAV.pdf FIN
Kauffman, Danna FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Greenfield, Aaron FAV LeadingAge Maryland - 2021 - SB 741 - Vaccination FIN
Kasemeyer, Pam Schwartz, Metz & Wise, P.A. FAV No Testimony FIN
O'Connor, Patricia Maryland Office of the Attorney General, Health Education and Advocacy Unit (HEAU) FWA SB0741 FWA_OAG HEAU.pdf
SB0741 OAG HEAU Amendments.pdf
FIN
Stallings, Nicole Maryland Hospital Association FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 741 - COVID-19 Testing Contact Tracing and Vacc
FIN
Sadusky, Dr. Bernard Maryland Association of Community Colleges (MACC) FWA SB0741_MACC_FWA_B.Sadusky.pdf FIN
Wilkerson, Alice Strong Future Maryland FAV SB741_StrongFutureMaryland_FAV.docx - Google Docs. FIN
Dzirasa , Letitia Baltimore City Health Department FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV SB0741_COVID-19_Act_MLC_FAV.pdf FIN
Sanderson, Michael Maryland Association of Counties (MACo) INFO SB0741-FIN_MACo_LOI.pdf FIN
DeMattos, Joseph Health Facilities Association of Maryland (HFAM) FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HFAM Testimony SB 741 Final.pdf
FIN
Elliott, Robyn FWA 2021 MNA SB 741 Senate Side.pdf FIN
Hogan, Patrick University System of Maryland INFO SB741_USM_INFO.pdf FIN
Bennardi, Maryland Department of Health /Office of Governmen Maryland Dept. of Health INFO 5 - FIN - SB 741 - MDH - LOI.pdf FIN
Coble, Annie Johns Hopkins FWA SB741- SWA- Hopkins - 2.22.2021.pdf FIN
Celentano, Matthew Funk & Bolton, P.A. UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Gilmore , Denise AFSCME Maryland FAV SB741_AFSCME3_FAV.pdf FIN
Mehu, Natasha Mayor's Office of Government Relations FAV SB0741-FIN-FAV.pdf FIN
Wilkins, Barbara INFO SB 741 COVID Testing, Contact Tracing and Vaccinat FIN
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 2-22-2021 at 827 PM FIN
Senator Rosapepe, Senator Rosapepe FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HGO
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV SB0741_COVID-19_Act_MLC_FAV.pdf HGO
DeMattos, Joseph Health Facilities Association of Maryland (HFAM) FAV HFAM Testimony SB 741_HGO.pdf HGO
Office of Governmental Affairs, Maryland Department of Health Maryland Dept. of Health INFO 2- HGO - SB 741 - MDH - LOI.pdf HGO
Elliott, Robyn FAV 2021 MNA SB 741 House Side.pdf HGO
mcavoy, vince UNF UNfavorable for SB741.pdf HGO
Purnell, Vanessa FAV SB 741 - COVID-19 Testing Contract Tracing and Vac HGO
Sanderson, Michael Maryland Association of Counties (MACo) INFO SB0741-HGO_MACo_LOI.pdf HGO
Coble, Annie Johns Hopkins FAV SB741- SWA- Hopkins - 3.30.2021.pdf HGO
Mehu, Natasha Mayor's Office of Government Relations FAV SB741-HGO-FAV.pdf HGO
Clark, Andy INFO SB741_USM_INFO_HOGAN - HGO.pdf HGO
O'Connor, Patricia Maryland Office of the Attorney General, Health Education and Advocacy Unit (HEAU) FAV Crossover_SB0741_FAV_OAG HEAU.pdf HGO
Click to return on the top page