Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0632 - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Small Business and Nonprofit Health Insurance Subsidies Program - Workgroup

Finance 3/2/2022 1:00:00 PM
Health and Government Operations 3/31/2022 1:30:00 PM
As of: 8/16/2022 3:23:54 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Hester, Senator Hester FAV Oral Testimony FIN
DeMarco, Vincent FAV Oral Testimony
MCHI_FAV_SB632.pdf
FIN
Lee, Jamal Breasia Productions FAV Oral Testimony
SB632_FAV_Jamal Lee.pdf
FIN
Rivkin, Deborah CareFirst BlueCross BlueShield FWA SB 632 Testimony FWA v2.pdf FIN
Koravos, JoAnne Montgomery County Women's Democratic Club FAV WDC Testimony SB0632-2022_FINAL.pdf FIN
Weldon, Richard Frederick County Chamber of Commerce FAV Oral Testimony
SB 632 testimony.pdf
FIN
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV SB0632_Small_Business_Subsidies_MLC_FAV.pdf FIN
Bogdan, Henry Maryland Nonprofits FAV Oral Testimony
SB 632 to Sen FIN - Support - Small Business Hea
FIN
Davis, Ernie The Leukemia and Lymphoma Society FAV SB632_LLS_FAV.pdf FIN
Fry Hester, Katie Maryland Senate FAV SB632 Sponsor Testimony.docx.pdf FIN
Redicker, Jane FWA SB632 - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Small B FIN
Egan, Ashley UULM-MD FAV Testimony in Support of SB 632 UULM-MD Betty McGar FIN
Miller Smith, Nora FAV LWVMD-SB 632- Maryland Health Benefit Exchange.pdf FIN
Taylor, Allison Kaiser Permanente INFO SB 632_Small Business Subsidies_LOI.pdf FIN
Frey, Paul Washington County Chamber of Commerce FAV Support SB 632 Wash. Co. Chamber.pdf FIN
Bagwell, Ashlie FAV No Testimony FIN
Krieger, Betsy Be the Change Bmore FAV BeTheChangeBmore_FAV_SB632.pdf FIN
Gillespie, Gary Salutation FAV SB632_CMEC_FAV.pdf FIN
Hudson, Lee Delaware-Maryland Synod, ELCA FAV sb632, small business, NFP subsidies on MD exchang FIN
Mehu, Natasha Mayor's Office of Government Relations FAV SB0632-FIN-FAV.pdf FIN
Eck, Raimee Maryland Public Health Association FAV SB632_FAV_MdPHA.pdf FIN
Gardner, Jan Frederick County Executive FAV SB 632_CEGardner_fav.pdf FIN
(MD), State of Maryland INFO 10 - SB 632 - X - FIN - MHBE - LOI.docx.pdf FIN
Diefenbach, Linda UNF No Testimony FIN
Conner, Sandra Baptist Ministers' Night Conference of Baltimore and Vicinity FAV BMNCBV_FAV_SB632 1 Final.pdf
MCBV SB 632 FAV Final.pdf
FIN
Evans Arthurs, Maureen Howard County Government FAV Oral Testimony
SB632_CalvinBall_FAV
FIN
McCartney, Mikal Microenterprise Council of Maryland FAV SB632_MCM_Favorable.pdf FIN
Driessen, Joan Association of Community Services of Howard County FWA SB 632-ACS-3.2.2022.pdf FIN
Paddy, Michael Maryland Hospital Association FAV SB 632 Maryland Health Benefit Exchange.pdf FIN
Eberle, Michele Maryland Health Benefit Exchange INFO No Testimony FIN
Doty, Daniel Hamilton-Lauraville Main Street, Inc. FAV Letter supporting SB 632.pdf FIN
Hyde, Amber All About Benefits, LLC FAV Oral Testimony
SB623 AllAboutBenefits_SB 632_FAV.pdf
SB623 AllAboutBenefits_SB 632_FAV.pdf
FIN
Glassman, Barry Harford County Government - County Executive FAV 2022 MGA - SB 632 - Maryland Heath Benefit Exchang FIN
Popham, Bryson Bryson F. Popham, P.A. FWA Oral Testimony
SB 632_MAHU_FWA.pdf
FIN
Flowers , Willie NAACP - Maryland FAV Oral Testimony
NAACP_SB632 .docx.pdf
FIN
Gorski, Jessica FAV SB632_FAV_WISE.pdf FIN
Brilliant, Franca Nonprofit Montgomery FAV Nonprofit Montgomery Written Testimony in Support FIN
Beller, Joel Baltimore County Government FAV BaltimoreCounty_FAV_SB0632.pdf FIN
Baron, Peter Anne Arundel County FAV Anne Arundel County _FAV_SB 632.pdf FIN
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 3-2-2022 at 1029 AM FIN
Senator Hester, Senator Hester FAV Oral Testimony HGO
Miller Smith, Nora FAV LWVMD-SB 632- Health Benefit Exchange- 3:31.pdf HGO
Flowers , Willie NAACP - Maryland FAV NAACP_HB709.docx.pdf HGO
DeMarco, Vincent FAV MCHI_FAV_SB632_March 31 (1).pdf HGO
Lee, Jamal Breasia Productions FAV SB632_FAV_Jamal Lee_March 31.pdf HGO
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV SB0632_Small_Business_Subsidies_MLC_FAV.pdf HGO
Guy, Randy Commissioners of St. Mary's County FAV 096 SB 632 CSMC signed.pdf HGO
(MD), State of Maryland INFO 7 - SB 632 - HGO - MHBE - LOI.pdf HGO
Driessen, Joan Association of Community Services of Howard County FAV SB 632-ACS-3.31.2022.pdf HGO
Mehu, Natasha Mayor's Office of Government Relations FAV SB0632-HGO-FAV.pdf HGO
Click to return on the top page