Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0623 - Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers

Judicial Proceedings 2/25/2021 11:00:00 AM
Judiciary 4/1/2021 1:30:00 PM
As of: 11/30/2022 11:45:20 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Lee, Senator Lee FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Mansfield, Andrea Maryland Chiefs of Police and Maryland Sheriffs' Association FAV MCPA-MSA_SB 623_Crimes Involving Computers-Support JPR
Niemann, Doyle Legislative Committee, Criminal Law & Practice Section, Maryland State Bar Association FAV HB425 - SB623 - Ransomware.pdf JPR
Witten, Jennifer Maryland Hospital Association INFO SB 623- Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers- JPR
Jung, Roy Office of the Attorney General -- Legislative Affairs Unit FAV 2021-02-25 SB 623 (Support).pdf JPR
Lee, Susan FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB623_FAV_Lee_2021_ml.pdf
JPR
Dahbura, Dr. Anton Johns Hopkins University Information Security Institute FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Kroll, Steve MSAA FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Rauschecker, Markus UMD Center for Health and Homeland Security FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 2-23-2021 at 601 PM JPR
Senator Lee, Senator Lee FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Niemann, Doyle Legislative Committee, Criminal Law & Practice Section, Maryland State Bar Association FAV hb425 - sb623 - ransomware.pdf JUD
Kemerer, Hannibal Office of Attorney General FAV 2021-04-01 (Crossover) SB 623 (Support).pdf JUD
Lee, Susan FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB623_FAV_Lee_2021.pdf
JUD
Volodin, Stacey Office of Senator Susan Lee FAV SB623 Testimony Judiciary.pdf JUD
Click to return on the top page