Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0571 - Consumer Protection – Online Products and Services – Data of Children (Maryland Kids Code)

Finance 2/14/2024 1:00:00 PM
Economic Matters 3/28/2024 1:00:00 PM
As of: 7/21/2024 9:38:34 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Kramer, Senator Kramer FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Montoya, Rita24 FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB571_Montoya_fav.pdf
FIN
Kingman, Andrew State Privacy & Security Coalition UNF SPSC - MD SB 571 (AADC) - Unfavorable Testimony 02 FIN
Rosen-Cohen, Nancy NCADD-Maryland FAV NCADD-MD - 2024 SB 571 FAV - Maryland Kids Code - FIN
Shea, Marisa 5Rights Foundation FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
MD Kids Code Coalition_SB571_Fav.pdf
FIN
Knox, Shelby ParentsTogether Action FAV SB571_ParentsTogetherAction_fav.pdf FIN
Cuiccio, Cary FAV SB571_Cuiccio_Fav.pdf FIN
Cline, Lisa FAV SB571_Cline_fav.pdf FIN
Phelps Jr, Ken The Episcopal Diocese of Maryland FAV sb 571 testimony.pdf FIN
Lee, Devin FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 571_ Lee_fav.pdf
FIN
Babb, Mara Chesapeake Regional Association of Student Councils FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
MASC Kids Code Resolution (1).pdf
FIN
Grosshans, Holly Common Sense Media FAV SB0571_Common Sense Media_Grosshans_FAV.pdf FIN
durkin, margaret UNF [MD] SB 571 Child Privacy_TechNet_pdf.pdf FIN
Jordan, Lisae C Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault (MCASA) FAV Kids Code - testimony - senate - 2024 - SB571 FAV. FIN
Rodell, Jordan Computer & Communications Industry Association UNF Virtual - Oral Testimony
2024-02-14 CCIA Written Opposition Testimony for M
FIN
Erdice, Stephanie Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Kids Code - testimony - senate - 2024 - SB571 FAV.
FIN
Frazier, Travis Association of National Advertisers INFO Joint Ad Trade Letter in Opposition to Maryland SB FIN
DSouza, Kirsten Chamber of Progress UNF Virtual - Oral Testimony
MD SB 571_UNFAV_Kirsten DSouza.pdf
FIN
Elliott, Elizabeth Maryland Association of School Health Nurses (MASHN) FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB571_MD_Assn_SchoolHealth_Nurses_fav.pdf
FIN
Park, Liz MD Association of Youth Service Bureaus FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
SB571_MAYSB_FAV.pdf
FIN
Kleiderlein, Holly Maryland School Counselor Association FAV 2024 MSCA SB 571 Senate Side FAV.pdf FIN
Melvin, Robert R Street Institute UNF FINAL MD SB 571 Testimony - Josh Withrow.pdf FIN
Ham, Nikki MSCA FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 571 Dr. Ham testimony.pdf
FIN
Hayes, Siobhan Digital Harbor Foundation FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 571 MD Kids Code_Digital Harbor Foundation_fav.
FIN
Szabo, Carl NetChoice UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
NetChoice Testimony against MD SB 571.pdf
FIN
Mitchell, Ellie Maryland Out of School Time Network FAV MOST_SB571.pdf FIN
Geismar, Arielle Design It For Us FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 571_Geismar_fav.pdf
FIN
Minor, Mia Matthew E. Minor Awareness Foundation FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB571_Minor_Fav.pdf
FIN
Minor, Todd Matthew E. Minor Awareness Foundation FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB571_Minor_Fav.pdf
FIN
McComas, Christine FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB571_McComas_Fav.pdf
FIN
Stewart, Laura Free State PTA FAV SB571.docx.pdf FIN
Jarrett, Beth FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
FIN
wolf, stephanie Maryland Psychological Association FAV MPA_Comm_SB571_LetterOfSupport_20240213.pdf FIN
Ward, Lindsay MD Chesapeake Chapter of the National Association of Pediatric Nurse Practitioners (NAPNAP) FAV No Testimony FIN
Sakamoto-Wengel, Steven M. Consumer Protection Division FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Willis, Henry FAV SB571_Willis_final.pdf
SB571_Willis_final.pdf
FIN
Geddes, Ann Mental Health Association of Maryland FAV SB0571_MHAMD_Fav.pdf FIN
Poynton, Aaron Harford County Board of Education FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB571_Durbin_fav Poynton Comments.pdf
FIN
Leposa, Bradley Maryland School Psychologists' Association FAV SB 0571 MSPA 2024 Letter of Support.pdf FIN
Woolums, John Maryland Assn. of Boards of Education FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 571.Consumer Protection for Data of Children.pd
FIN
Park, Sam Design It For Us FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB571_Sam_fav.pdf
FIN
O'Connor, Andrew ESA UNF Maryland SB 571 ESA Letter 2.14.2024 FINAL.pdf FIN
Hornbeck, Matt Hampstead Hill Academy FAV Virtual - Oral Testimony
SB571 Testimony from Principal Matt Hornbeck.pdf
FIN
Griffin, Andrew Maryland Chamber of Commerce INFO SB 571_MDCC_Maryland Kids Code_INF.pdf FIN
Green, Christina Maryland Coalition of Families FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
MCF Testimony SB 571-FAV.pdf
FIN
Hinkle, Haley Fairplay FAV SB 571_Fairplay_fav.pdf FIN
Tozaki, Cpt. Keegan Howard County Department of Fire & Rescue Services FAV Signed_DCRS_Support - SB 571 Maryland Kids Code.pd FIN
Elliott, Robyn FAV 2024 ACNM SB 571 Senate Side.pdf
2024 LCPCM SB 571 Senate Side.pdf
FIN
American Academy of Pediatrics, Maryland Chapter FAV SB0571_FAV_MDAAP_Cons. Prot. - Online Prod. & Serv FIN
Snyder, Rebecca UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
MDDC Oppose SB571.pdf
FIN
Fannon, Mary Pat FAV SB 571 - Consumer Protection – Online Products and FIN
Lamb, Lauren Maryland State Education Association FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB571_MSEA_Lamb_FAV.pdf
FIN
KLUGE, JEFFREY KidsTechEthics, dba Holistic Ethics FAV Maryland SB 571 in support written testimony_Kluge FIN
Abrams, Hanna FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
CPD Written Testimony SB 571 SUPPORT with AMENDMEN
FIN
Arowolo, David self FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Testimony.pdf
FIN
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 2-13-2024 at 840 PM FIN
Senator Kramer, Senator Kramer FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
ECM
Rosen-Cohen, Nancy NCADD-Maryland FAV NCADD-MD - 2024 SB 571 FAV - Maryland Kids Code - ECM
Rodell, Jordan Computer & Communications Industry Association UNF 2024-03-28 CCIA Written Opposition Testimony for M ECM
Elliott, Robyn FAV 2024 ACNM SB 571 House Side.pdf
2024 LCPCM SB 571 House Side.pdf
ECM
Snyder, Rebecca UNF MDDC Oppose SB571 - Crossover concerns.pdf ECM
Woolums, John Maryland Assn. of Boards of Education FAV SB 571.Consumer Protection for Data of Children HO ECM
Abrams, Hanna FWA CPD Written Testimony SB 571 CROSSOVER.pdf ECM
Allen, Hannah Maryland Chamber of Commerce INFO SB 571_MDCC_Maryland Kids Code_INF HOUSE.pdf ECM
Lamb, Lauren Maryland State Education Association FAV XSB571_MSEA_Lamb_FAV.pdf ECM
Click to return on the top page