Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0373 - Criminal Law - Theft - Mail and Arrow Key

Judicial Proceedings 2/2/2024 10:30:00 AM
Judiciary 4/1/2024 1:00:00 PM
As of: 7/23/2024 10:21:39 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Waldstreicher, Senator Waldstreicher FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Shoemaker, Jason Maryland State's Attorneys' Association FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Final Letter Supporting SB374 2-2024.pdf
JPR
Rosa, Richard FAV No Testimony JPR
Flynn, Captain Stacey Montgomery County Police, MD FAV GA24.Testimony in Support of SB0373.MCPD.Chief Jon JPR
Doyle, Robert MD Federation of NARFE SLC FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 373 Testimony R. Doyle NARFE Feb 2, 2024.pdf
JPR
Wright, Tracy FAV SB0373 Safe Carrier Act 2024.pdf JPR
Frey, Leslie Montgomery County FAV SB0373_CoA_fav.pdf JPR
Enten, Robert Maryland Multi-Housing Assoc FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Feinstein, Debbie Montgomery County State's Attorney's Office FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Britt, Adiena N/A FAV No Testimony JPR
Gilman-Reilly, Forrest Montgomery County State's Attorney's Office FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Richards, Evan Maryland Bankers Association FAV SB0373 - FAV- GR24.pdf JPR
DIRienzo, Louis U.S. Postal Inspection Service FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Written Testimony - Louis DiRienzo (002).pdf
JPR
Lang, Alan FAV No Testimony JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 2-1-2024 at 649 PM JPR
Senator Waldstreicher, Senator Waldstreicher FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Morgan, Karen AARP FAV SB373_AARP_Morgan_FAV.pdf JUD
Pedersen, Stacy FWA Vote YES on SB373 with Amendments.pdf JUD
Richards, Evan Maryland Bankers Association FAV SB0373 - JUD - MBA - FAV - GR24.pdf JUD
Lang, Alan FAV 2024 SB0373 Testimony For 2024-04-01.pdf JUD
Click to return on the top page