Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0360 - State Government – Notaries Public – Notary Public Fund and Remote Notarial Acts

Judicial Proceedings 2/9/2021 1:00:00 PM
Health and Government Operations 3/31/2021 1:30:00 PM
As of: 10/26/2021 12:04:13 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Rosapepe, Senator Rosapepe FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Musser, Tobias FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Wobensmith - Secretary of State, John Office of the Maryland Secretary of State FAV SB360 JPR- Notary Special Fund - Feb 9 2021.pdf JPR
D'Ambrosia, John FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Lehman, Mindy Maryland Bankers Assocation FAV Oral Testimony
GR 21 - SB 360- MBA written testimony - Notary Pub
JPR
Friedman, Eli Harris Jones & Malone FWA MLTA SB 360 written testimony.pdf JPR
Connelly, Kathie n/a FAV Oral Testimony JPR
Kemerer, Hannibal Office of Attorney General FAV 2021-02-09 SB 360 (Support).pdf JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 2-8-2021 at 1012 AM JPR
Senator Rosapepe, Senator Rosapepe FAV Oral Testimony HGO
Lehman, Mindy Maryland Bankers Assocation FAV GR 21 - SB 360- MBA written testimony - Notary Pub HGO
Click to return on the top page