Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0213 - Health Occupations - Clinical Nurse Specialists - Prescribing

Finance 2/14/2023 1:00:00 PM
Health and Government Operations 3/22/2023 1:00:00 PM
As of: 5/24/2024 8:47:24 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Ellis, Senator Ellis FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Delean-Botkin, Susan Familycare 0f Easton FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
FIN
Lang, Beverly Nurse Practitioner Association of Maryland FAV LOS SB 213 CNS Prescribing NPAM 2023.pdf
LOS SB213.HB278 CNS Prescribing NPAM.pdf
FIN
Devaris, Shirley FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
devaris 2023 testimony.pdf
FIN
Brocato, Deborah UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
2023 SB213 Written Testimony.pdf
FIN
Sepulveda, Sabrina Harborside Behavioral Health FAV CNS Prescribing- Fact sheet HB0278_SB0213 (1).pdf
Testimony Senate SB213 02.13.2023.pdf
FIN
Stanek, Gena Chesapeake Bay Affiliate of the National Association of Clinical Nurse Specialist FAV CNS Prescribing- Fact sheet HB0278SB0213.pdf
Stanek_Testimony_SB-213_2-13-23_final.pdf
FIN
Kress, William Kress Hammen FAV MANA SB 213 Favorable CNS.pdf FIN
Allan, Sharon CBANACNS FAV Clinical Story in Support of SB 213.2.13.2023.pdf FIN
Young, Samantha The Chesapeake Bay Affiliate of the National Association of Clinical Nurse Specialists FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Final oral testimony SB213.sy.2023.pdf
FIN
Tompsett, Thomas Harris Jones & Malone UNF SB 213 - Oppose - MPS WPS.pdf FIN
Tilley, Claudia FAV Written Testimony SB 213 CNS Prescribing.pdf FIN
Paddy, Michael Public Policy Partners FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
2022 ACNM SB 213 Senate Side FAV.pdf
2022 MNA SB 213 Senate Side FAV.docx.pdf
FIN
Moss, Pamela CBANACNS FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
CNS Prescribing- Fact sheet HB0278SB0213.pdf
PMoss SB0213 verbal testimony.pdf
PMoss SB0213 written testimony.pdf
FIN
(MD), State of Maryland FWA 1 - SB 213 - FIN - MBON - LOSWA.docx.pdf FIN
Livanos, Nicole National Council of State Boards of Nursing FAV NCSBN_SB213_FinalSupport.pdf FIN
Fink, Nelda UNF No Testimony FIN
Diana, Lorraine FAV LorraineCNS SB213.2.14.23writtentestimony.pdf FIN
Krienke, Jane Maryland Hospital Association FAV SB 213- Health Occupations- Clinical Nurse Special FIN
Thurman, Paul FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Statement support for SB0213-HB0278 - Educational
FIN
Hiles, Marianne FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
2023.02.13 Ltr to Senator Melony Griffith (re Supp
Marianne Hiles-SUPPORT SB213 Health Occupations -
NACNS letter of SUPPORT. Maryland.SB 213.pdf
FIN
Ellis, Arthur FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Testimony for Senate Bill 213 - Senator Ellis (002
FIN
Bresnahan, Tammy AARP Maryland FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 213 Clinical Nurse Specialists Prescribing Auth
FIN
Nash, PhD, RN, PHCNS-BC, FAAN, Lynn Capt. (Ret.) U.S. Public Health Service FWA SB213_CNS Prescribing_Nash_FWA FIN
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 2-13-2023 at 407 PM FIN
Senator Ellis, Senator Ellis FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
HGO
Brocato, Deborah UNF 2023 SB213 Written Testimony.pdf HGO
Bresnahan, Tammy AARP Maryland FAV SB 213 Crossover Clinical Nurse Specialists Prescr HGO
Tompsett, Thomas Harris Jones & Malone UNF SB 213 - Oppose - MPS WPS (House Testimony).pdf HGO
Krienke, Jane Maryland Hospital Association FAV SB 213- Health Occupations- Clinical Nurse Special HGO
Ellis, Arthur FAV Updated Testimony - SB 213.pdf HGO
(MD), State of Maryland FAV 4 - SB 213 (3rd) - HGO - BON - LOS.pdf HGO
Click to return on the top page