Committee Testimony and Witness Signup
SB0156 - Workgroup on Newborn Home Visiting Services - Establishment
Finance 1/29/2025 1:00:00 PM
Health and Government Operations 3/19/2025 2:15:00 PM
As of: 4/24/2025 7:41:05 PM
Name | Organization | Position | Testimony | Committee |
---|---|---|---|---|
Senator Lewis Young, Senator Lewis Young | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
FIN | |
Friedman, Kimberly | Family Connects International | FAV |
Virtual - Oral Testimony MD SB 156 Testimony Support - Family Connects Inte |
FIN |
Gardner, Jan | Former Frederick County Executive | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony Written Testimony SB 156.pdf |
FIN |
Miller Smith, Nora | League of Women Voters Maryland | FAV | SB 156- LWVMD- FAV- Universal Newborn Nurse Home V | FIN |
Macomber, Virginia | Women's Democratic Club | FAV | SB0156 Universal Newborn Nurse Home Visit WDC Test | FIN |
Mandel, Rachel | Rachel Mandel MD Consulting LLC | FAV | R_Mandel MD Letter HB334_SB156.pdf | FIN |
Vocci, Kyra | FAV | Kyra Kolbe Vocci Testimony.pdf | FIN | |
Morgan, Jessica | Maryland Legislative Agenda for Women (MLAW) | FAV | MLAW Testimony - SB156 - Universal Newborn Nurse H | FIN |
Phelps Jr, Ken | The Episcopal Diocese of Maryland | FAV | SB0156 January 29, 2025 Written Testimony (1).pdf | FIN |
Frederick, Alyssa | FAV |
Virtual - Oral Testimony Alyssa Frederick Family Connects SB156_HB334 writt |
FIN | |
Alexandre, Jonathan | Maryland Family Institute | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
FIN |
Murphy, JD | MD Chesapeake Chapter of the National Association of Pediatric Nurse Practitioners (NAPNAP) | FAV | SB156 2025 NAPNAP.pdf | FIN |
Celentano, Matthew | The League of Life and Health Insurers of Maryland | UNF | DOCS-#238541-v1-SB_156_League_Oppose_Mandate.pdf | FIN |
Schlattman, Suzanne | Maryland Citizens' Health Initiative, Inc. | FAV | SB 156_FAV_MCHI_SCHLATTMAN.pdf | FIN |
Blake, Erica | FAV | SB156 & HB344 Erica Blake Personal Testimony.pdf | FIN | |
O'Connor, Michael | City of Frederick | FAV | 2025-01-29 SB156 Position.pdf | FIN |
Arias, Diane | Maryland Catholic Conference | FAV | Maryland Catholic Conference_FAV_SB156.pdf | FIN |
Diggs, Jamie | FAV | Testimony on Family Connect bills.pdf | FIN | |
Danis, Jodi | Montgomery County Commission for Women | FAV | SB0156--Universal Newborn Nurse Home Visiting serv | FIN |
Hudson, Lee | Delaware-Maryland Synod, ELCA | FAV | sb156- post-natal care FIN 1-29-2025.pdf | FIN |
Witten, Jennifer | LifeBridge Health | FAV | LBH FAV SB156-Universal Newborn Nurse Home Visitin | FIN |
Fitzwater, Jessica | Frederick County Executive | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony SB 0156, FAV, FCG, OCE, JF, LS25.pdf |
FIN |
Meyerovich, Mark | UNF | No Testimony | FIN | |
Bode, Claire | FAV | No Testimony | FIN | |
Furgol, Malcolm | Coalition for a Healthier Frederick County | FAV | Written Testimony for Universal Newborn Home Visit | FIN |
Highsmith Vernick, Nikki | The Horizon Foundation | FAV | No Testimony | FIN |
Lewis Young, Senator Karen | Senator Karen Lewis Young | FWA |
SB0156 Family Connects Cover Letter (Written Testi
Universal Nurse Newborn Home Visits for All Maryla |
FIN |
Morris, Austin | Children's National Hospital | FAV | Children's National Testimony - SB 156 - Tara Floy | FIN |
Thompson, Lauren | Community After Birth | FAV | Written Testimony_CAB.pdf | FIN |
Elliott, Robyn | FAV |
2025 ACNM SB 156 Senate Side.pdf
2025 MCHS SB 5 Senate Side.pdf 2025 MdAPA SB 5 Senate Side.pdf |
FIN | |
Trimbath, Jeffrey | Maryland Family Institute | UNF |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
FIN |
Lynch, Meghan | Maryland Department of Health | UNF | SB 156-FIN-MDH-LOC.docx (1).pdf | FIN |
Shackelford, Derek | City Council | FAV | Shackelford_SB156 Position_20250127.pdf | FIN |
Iverson, Jennifer | Prince George's Child Resource Center, Inc. | FAV | SB0156 CRC Support 2025.pdf | FIN |
Grant, Marie | Maryland Insurance Administration | INFO | Final SB156 - MIA - LOI.pdf | FIN |
Mauer, William | FAV | No Testimony | FIN | |
Lang, Alan | UNF | No Testimony | FIN | |
Katz, Janet | UNF | No Testimony | FIN | |
Kaplowitz, Richard KAP | Year | FAV | Testimony in support of SB0156- Universal Newborn | FIN |
(MD), State of Maryland | UNF | SB 156 - MACHO - FIN - LOC.pdf | FIN | |
Dorsey, Catherine | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony Family Connects- CDorsey written testimony SB156-H |
FIN | |
Dodge, Kenneth | Sanford School | FAV |
Virtual - Oral Testimony |
FIN |
Klingenmaier, Lisa | Maryland Family Network | FAV | SB 156 - MFN - Home Visiting - FAV - Klingenmaier. | FIN |
Hamilton, Rebecca | UNF | No Testimony | FIN | |
Brown, Stacey | The Family Tree | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony SB 156 Written Testimony The Family Tree .pdf |
FIN |
Mehu, Natasha | Maryland Hospital Association | FAV | SB 156 - Universal Newborn Nurse Home Visiting Ser | FIN |
Olivo, Pilar | FWA |
In Person - Oral Testimony SB 156 Family Connects Frederick County testimony. |
FIN | |
Billups, Akiyyah | BMBB Frederick | FWA | HB334_SB156_BMBBFrederick_FWA.pdf | FIN |
Philip, Diana | Coalition to Protect Maryland's Children | FAV | SB0156 CPMC FAV.pdf | FIN |
Caucus, Maryland Women's | FAV | SB156_WomensCaucus_FAV | FIN | |
Caucus, Legislative Latino | FAV | SB156_MLLC_FAV | FIN | |
Testimony, All | N/A | Merged Testimony as of 1-29-2025 at 306 PM | FIN | |
Senator Lewis Young, Senator Lewis Young | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
HGO | |
Morgan, Jessica | Maryland Legislative Agenda for Women (MLAW) | FAV | MLAW Testimony - SB156 - Universal Newborn Nurse H | HGO |
Arias, Diane | Maryland Catholic Conference | FAV | Maryland Catholic Conference_FAV_SB156_HouseCross. | HGO |
Kaplowitz, Richard KAP | Year | FWA | SB0156 crossfile FWA - Universal Newborn Nurse Hom | HGO |
Hudson, Lee | Delaware-Maryland Synod, ELCA | FAV | sb156-postnatal care HGO 3-19-2025.pdf | HGO |
Lynch, Meghan | Maryland Department of Health | UNF | SB 156 -HGO - MDH - LOC.docx (1).pdf | HGO |
Lewis Young, Senator Karen | Senator Karen Lewis Young | FAV | SB0156 Family Connects Cover Letter House.pdf | HGO |
Elliott, Robyn | American College of Nurse Midwives -Maryland Affiliate | FAV | 2025 ACNM SB 156 House Side.pdf | HGO |
Navabi, Jennifer | Maryland Community Health System | FAV | 2025 MCHS SB 156 House Side.pdf | HGO |
Philip, Diana | Coalition to Protect Maryland's Children | FAV | SB0156 CPMC FAV HGO.pdf | HGO |
Fitzwater, Jessica | Frederick County Executive | FAV | SB 0156 FAV FCG OCE JF LS25 HGO.pdf | HGO |
Mehu, Natasha | Maryland Hospital Association | FAV | Crossover Testimony_SB 156- Workgroup on Universal | HGO |
Morrow, Beth | FAV | SB 156_MFN_Home Visiting_FAV-Xover.pdf | HGO | |
Themelis, Nina | Mayor's Office of Government Relations | FWA | SB0156-HGO-FWA.pdf | HGO |
Olivo, Pilar | FWA | Family Connects Frederick County 3.19.25 HGO Heari | HGO |
Validation
Please fix the following:
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools