Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0114 - Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Conviction and Subsequent Offender Penalties - Driving While Privilege Is Canceled, Suspended, Refused, or Revoked

Judicial Proceedings 1/19/2021 11:00:00 AM
Judiciary 4/1/2021 1:30:00 PM
As of: 12/3/2021 4:48:59 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator McCray, Senator McCray FAV No Testimony JPR
Kroll, Steven Maryland State's Attorneys' Association UNF Oral Testimony JPR
Kahl, Catherine INFO DPSCS_LOI_SB0114.pdf JPR
Williams, Krystal MARYLAND OFFICE OF THE PUBLIC DEFENDER FAV OPD Written Testimony_SB0114.pdf JPR
Jung, Roy Office of the Attorney General -- Legislative Affairs Unit FAV 2021-01-19 SB 114 (Support).pdf JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 1-17-2021 at 837 AM JPR
Senator McCray, Senator McCray FAV Oral Testimony JUD
Kemerer, Hannibal Office of Attorney General FAV 2021-04-01 (Crossover) SB 114 (Support).pdf JUD
McCray, Cory MGA FAV SB 114 House.pdf JUD
Gordon , J. Wyndel FAV Oral Testimony JUD
Bradley, Terrance FAV Oral Testimony JUD
Click to return on the top page