Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0088 - Election Law - Municipal Elections - Administration

Education, Energy, and the Environment 2/5/2025 2:00:00 PM
Ways and Means 3/18/2025 1:00:00 PM
As of: 4/24/2025 7:32:53 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Kagan, Senator Kagan FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
EEE
Lang, Alan FAV 2025 SB0088 Testimony For 2025-02-05.pdf
2025 SB0088 Testimony For 2025-02-05.pdf
EEE
Ashton, Monique City of Rockville FAV SB0088_FAV_City of Rockville_Election Law - State EEE
Antoine, Joanne Common Cause Maryland FAV SB 88 - Election Law – State Administrator of Elec EEE
Mauer, William FAV No Testimony EEE
Fiore, Justin Maryland Municipal League FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
MML - SB 88 - FAV.pdf
EEE
Kagan, Sen. Cheryl Maryland State Senate FAV Testimony - Municipal Elections.pdf EEE
Lang, Alan FAV 2025 SB0088 Testimony For 2025-02-05.pdf
2025 SB0088 Testimony For 2025-02-05.pdf
EEE
Roca, Lucas FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Municipal Elections SB88 Testimony (LAR 02_03_25).
EEE
Rybczynski, Adam City of Havre de Grace FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
EEE
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 2-4-2025 at 949 AM EEE
Senator Kagan, Senator Kagan FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
W&M
Drayton, Morgan Common Cause MD FAV SB 88 - Election Law – Municipal Elections – Admin W&M
Lang, Alan FAV 2025 SB0088 Testimony For 2025-03-18.pdf W&M
Kagan, Sen. Cheryl Maryland State Senate FAV House Testimony - Municipal Elections - SB88.pdf W&M
Click to return on the top page