Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

SB0011 - Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Vendor Contracts

Judicial Proceedings 2/1/2024 1:00:00 PM
Judiciary 3/28/2024 1:00:00 PM
As of: 7/16/2024 4:32:27 PM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Senator Carter, Senator Carter FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Miller, Linda Maryland Judiciary UNF sb11.pdf JPR
Emerson, Jessica The Human Trafficking Prevention Project FAV HTPP SB 11 Unit Rule Testimony- FAVORABLE.pdf JPR
Amanuel, Yanet FAV SB 11_FAV_Amanuel.pdf JPR
Carter, Jill FWA SB 11 Testimony.pdf JPR
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV SB0011_Partial_Expungement_MLC_FAV.pdf JPR
Kroll, Steven Maryland State's Attorneys' Association UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Spangler, Adam Office of Attorney General FAV 2024-02-01 SB 11 (Support).pdf JPR
Caroom, Philip Maryland Alliance for Justice Reform FAV No Testimony JPR
Ahearn, Charlotte Maryland Legal Aid FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB 11 Favorable Testimony Maryland Legal Aid.pdf
JPR
Rosen-Cohen, Nancy NCADD-Maryland FAV NCADD-MD - 2024 SB 11 FAV - Partial Expungement - JPR
Stewart, Vicky Health Care for the Homeless FAV Health Care for the Homeless - FAV SB 11 - Unit Ru JPR
Green, Linda Life After Release FAV Bill to support Partial Expungement.pdf JPR
Jordan, Lisae C Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault (MCASA) UNF Expungement - unit rule - senate - 2024 - SB11 UNF JPR
Dews, Christopher Cornerstone Government Affairs FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
SB0011_FAV_CFUF.pdf
JPR
Huffman, Mark Marylanders Against Poverty FAV SB11_MAP_FAV.pdf JPR
mcavoy, vince UNF No Testimony JPR
Gardner, Becca MAJR FAV SB0011_FAV_BeccaGardner (1).pdf JPR
Davis, Mary Denise OPD FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
Testimony - 2024 - SB 11..pdf
JPR
Quarles, Antoin Helping Oppressed People Excel (H.O.P.E.) FAV SB0011_FAV_HOPE.pdf JPR
Baynor, Gary HTP Homes - Witness FAV SB0011_FAV_GaryBaynor (1).pdf JPR
Bridges, Kam Job Opportunities Task Force FAV SB 11 - Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement - JPR
Townsend, George Maryland Volunteer Lawyers Service FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
MVLS Testimony SB0011.pdf
JPR
Britt, Adiena N/A FAV No Testimony JPR
Mehu, Natasha Chiefs and Sheriffs Associations UNF MCPA-MSA_SB 11 Partial Expungment _Oppose.pdf JPR
Coleman, Harold Private Citizen FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JPR
Cox, John Baltimore County States Attorneys Office, Maryland States Attorneys Association UNF In Person - Oral Testimony
SB11.pdf
JPR
Kahl, Catherine DPSCS INFO SB 11_DPSCS_LOI.pdf JPR
Bowie, City Council City of Bowie FAV COB Letter of Support Senate Bill 0100 1.31.24.pdf JPR
Gallagher, E. Flannery University of Baltimore Law School, Center for Criminal Justice Reform FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
2024.01.31 CCJR SB 11 FAV .pdf
JPR
Lewis-Clark, Bobbie Center for Urban Families (CFUF) FAV SB0011_FAV_BobbiLewisClark (1).pdf JPR
Bruce, Donna CFUF - Witness FAV No Testimony JPR
Rosenburg, Glen Private Citizen FAV No Testimony JPR
Battle, Carlos New Shiloh Baptist Church FAV No Testimony JPR
Dews, Christopher Center for Urban Families (CFUF) FAV SB0011_FAV_CFUF-SignOn.pdf JPR
Henry, Donte HTP Homes - Witness FAV No Testimony JPR
Banks, Pastor Cornerstone Full Gospel Church FAV SB0011_FAV_CFGC (1).pdf JPR
Levi, Gwen Maryland Justice Project FAV No Testimony JPR
Hanson, Nicole Out for Justice FAV No Testimony JPR
Testimony, All N/A Merged Testimony as of 2-1-2024 at 858 AM JPR
Senator Carter, Senator Carter FAV In Person - Oral Testimony
JUD
Gally, Eric FWA In Person - Oral Testimony
HB 550 SB 11 Amendments.pdf
JUD
Spangler, Adam Office of Attorney General FAV 2024-03-28 SB 11 (Support).pdf JUD
Rosen-Cohen, Nancy NCADD-Maryland FAV NCADD-MD - 2024 SB 11 FAV - Partial Expungement - JUD
Miller, Linda Maryland Judiciary UNF sb11amend.pdf JUD
Plante, Cecilia Maryland Legislative Coalition FAV SB0011_Partial_Expungement_MLC_FAV.pdf JUD
Davis, Mary Denise OPD FAV Written Testimony - 2024 - SB 11 ((partial expunge JUD
Huffman, Mark Marylanders Against Poverty FAV SB11_MAP_FAVOR.pdf JUD
Bridges, Kam Job Opportunities Task Force FAV SB 11 - Department of Public Safety and Correction JUD
Bogdan, Henry Maryland Nonprofits FAV No Testimony JUD
Braveheart, T. Shekhinah Justice PoIicy Institute FAV No Testimony JUD
Warnken, Heather University of Baltimore School of Law Center for Criminal Justice Reform FAV No Testimony JUD
Dews, Christopher Center for Urban Families (CFUF) FAV CROSSOVER_SB0011_FAV_CFUF.PDF JUD
Click to return on the top page