Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Committee Testimony and Witness Signup

HB1320 - Baltimore City - Property Taxes - Authority to Set Special Rates

Ways and Means 3/9/2021 1:30:00 PM
As of: 10/23/2021 3:32:06 AM
Name Organization Position Testimony Committee
Delegate Boyce, Delegate Boyce FAV Oral Testimony W&M
Vincent, Joshua Center for the Study of Economics FAV CPTR_Baltimore.pdf
HB1320_Testimony_CSE.pdf
W&M
Faass, Josephine Center for Property Tax Reform INFO Testimony relevant to HB1320 March 9, 2021.pdf W&M
Gaztanaga, Lorenzo FAV Baltimore City Council Resolution sent to the Mary
Testimony for HB 1320.pdf
W&M
Dodson, Edward FAV dodson-edward_testimony-on-md-hb1320-mar-2021.pdf W&M
Mosby, Baltimore City Council President Nick J. Office of Baltimore City Council President Nick J. Mosby FAV HB 1320_FAV Testimony_City Council President Nick W&M
Boyce, Regina T. FAV W&M Cmte Letter - HB 1320 - Del. Boyce.pdf W&M
Mehu, Natasha Mayor's Office of Government Relations FAV HB1320-WM-FAV.pdf W&M
Rybeck, Rick Just Economics LLC FAV Baltimore City Council Res - PRO SVT 1992 (Sent to
HB 1320 - Just Economics Testimony - 2021-03-09.pd
HB1276_MACo_SUPPORT_Kinnally (1).pdf
W&M
Roth-Gormley, Shana Community Law Center FAV No Testimony W&M
Ramos, Odette Baltimore City Council FAV HB1320 Testimony 3.9.2021 W&M
Ramos, Odette FAV Councilwoman Ramos HB1320 Testimony 3.9.2021 (1) W&M
Boyce, Delegate Regina FAV Delegate Boyce Written Testimony for HB1320 W&M
Click to return on the top page